Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1078492

EP1078492 - PREVENTING UNAUTHORIZED USE OF SERVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.01.2008
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, LU
published on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [2001/09]For all designated states
Nokia Networks Oy
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / USKELA, Sami
Siltasaarenkatu 26 A 1
FIN-00530 Helsinki / FI
 [2001/09]
Representative(s)Äkräs, Tapio Juhani , et al
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]Äkräs, Tapio Juhani , et al
Oy Kolster Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date99952135.418.05.1999
[2001/09]
WO1999FI00432
Priority number, dateFI1998000113220.05.1998         Original published format: FI 981132
[2001/09]
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9960750
Date:25.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1078492
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999
[2001/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1078492
Date:14.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/11]
Search report(s)International search reportSE20.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/32
[2001/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/09]
TitleGerman:VERMEIDUNG DER UNBERECHTIGTEN NUTZUNG EINES DIENSTES[2001/09]
English:PREVENTING UNAUTHORIZED USE OF SERVICE[2001/09]
French:PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'EMPECHER L'UTILISATION NON AUTORISEE D'UN SERVICE[2001/09]
Entry into regional phase18.05.1999Translation filed 
03.11.2000National basic fee paid 
03.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
03.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
04.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2007Fee for grant paid
18.01.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.12.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.03.2007
BE14.03.2007
CH14.03.2007
CY14.03.2007
DK14.03.2007
FI14.03.2007
IT14.03.2007
LI14.03.2007
NL14.03.2007
IE18.05.2007
LU18.05.2007
MC31.05.2007
SE14.06.2007
GR15.06.2007
ES25.06.2007
PT14.08.2007
[2010/06]
Former [2008/23]AT14.03.2007
BE14.03.2007
CH14.03.2007
DK14.03.2007
FI14.03.2007
IT14.03.2007
LI14.03.2007
NL14.03.2007
IE18.05.2007
MC31.05.2007
SE14.06.2007
GR15.06.2007
ES25.06.2007
PT14.08.2007
Former [2008/21]AT14.03.2007
BE14.03.2007
CH14.03.2007
DK14.03.2007
FI14.03.2007
LI14.03.2007
NL14.03.2007
MC31.05.2007
SE14.06.2007
GR15.06.2007
ES25.06.2007
PT14.08.2007
Former [2008/18]AT14.03.2007
BE14.03.2007
CH14.03.2007
DK14.03.2007
FI14.03.2007
LI14.03.2007
NL14.03.2007
MC31.05.2007
SE14.06.2007
ES25.06.2007
PT14.08.2007
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9521509  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al);
 [XP]WO9918746  (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM MOBIL [DE]);
 [A]DE19647109  (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM MOBIL [DE])