blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1105619

EP1105619 - DRILLING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DRILLING A WELL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.08.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BENTEC GMBH Drilling & Oilfield Systems
Deilmannstrasse 1
48455 Bad Bentheim / DE
[2003/41]
Former [2001/24]For all designated states
BENTEC GMBH, Drilling & Oilfield Systems
Deilmannstrasse 1
48455 Bad Bentheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / DIRKS, Thorsten
Salzberger Strasse 81
48465 Schüttorf / DE
 [2001/24]
Representative(s)Köckeritz, Günter, et al
TUI AG
Patente & Lizenzen
Karl-Wiechert-Allee 4
30625 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/24]Köckeritz, Günter, et al
Preussag AG Patente & Lizenzen Karl-Wiechert-Allee 4
30625 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date99952441.619.08.1999
[2001/24]
WO1999DE02598
Priority number, dateDE1998103769219.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19837692
[2001/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0011306
Date:02.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/09]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1105619
Date:13.06.2001
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1105619
Date:08.10.2003
Language:DE
[2003/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.04.2000
ClassificationIPC:E21B15/00
[2001/24]
CPC:
E21B19/20 (EP,US); E21B15/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/24]
TitleGerman:BOHRVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ABTEUFEN EINER BOHRUNG[2001/24]
English:DRILLING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DRILLING A WELL[2001/24]
French:DISPOSITIF DE FORAGE ET PROCEDE DE FORAGE D'UN PUITS[2001/24]
Entry into regional phase26.01.2001National basic fee paid 
26.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/24]
10.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.07.2003Fee for grant paid
08.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY08.10.2003
FI08.10.2003
IE08.10.2003
DK08.01.2004
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
ES19.01.2004
PT08.03.2004
[2008/18]
Former [2007/23]CY08.10.2003
FI08.10.2003
IE08.10.2003
DK08.01.2004
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
ES19.01.2004
Former [2004/46]FI08.10.2003
IE08.10.2003
DK08.01.2004
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
ES19.01.2004
Former [2004/41]FI08.10.2003
IE08.10.2003
DK08.01.2004
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
Former [2004/40]FI08.10.2003
IE08.10.2003
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
Former [2004/33]FI08.10.2003
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
Former [2004/26]FI08.10.2003
SE08.01.2004
Former [2004/24]SE08.01.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]US3734211  (HAISCH A, et al) [A] 26* column A; figure - *;
 [X]US3750769  (YOUNG J, et al) [X] 1 * column A; figure - *;
 [A]FR2267008  (WIRTH CO KG MASCH BOHR [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]FR2544789  (BONNE ESPERANCE [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]US4899832  (BIERSCHEID JR ROBERT C [US]) [X] 1 * column A; figure - *;
 [X]EP0379187  (BAUER SPEZIALTIEFBAU [DE]) [X] 1,28 * abstract *
by applicantEP0243210
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.