Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1182777

EP1182777 - SELF-CORRECTIVE RANDOMIZER-ENCRYPTOR SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/09]SELF-CORRECTOR RANDOMIZER-ENCRYPTOR SYSTEM AND METHOD
[2003/14]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Etechnaf, S.L.
C. Senieta no. 3, Esc. B 2o 1a
43540 Sant Carles de la Rapita / ES
[N/P]
Former [2003/48]For all designated states
Etechnaf, S.L.
C. Senieta no. 3, Esc. B 2o 1o
43540 Sant Carles de la Rapita (Barcelona) / ES
Former [2002/09]For all designated states
Ferre Herrero, Angel José
Avenida Constitucio 3 bis, 3.
43540 Sant Carles de la Rapita / ES
Inventor(s)01 / Ferré Herrero, Angel José
Avenida Constitucio 3 bis-3.
43540 Sant Carles de la Rapita / ES
 [2003/48]
Former [2002/09]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Ponti Sales, Adelaida , et al
Oficina Ponti
C. Consell de Cent, 322
08007 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Ponti Sales, Adelaida , et al
Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent 322
08007 Barcelona / ES
Former [2002/09]Ponti Sales, Adelaida , et al
C. Consell de Cent, 322
08007 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date99953987.727.10.1999
[2002/09]
WO1999ES00345
Priority number, dateES1999000114218.05.1999         Original published format: ES 9901142
[2002/09]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0008907
Date:24.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1182777
Date:27.02.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000
[2002/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1182777
Date:01.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:ES08.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/00
[2003/14]
Former International [2002/09]H03J1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/09]
TitleGerman:SELBSTKORRIGIERENDES VERSCHLEIERUNGS-UND VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN[2003/14]
English:SELF-CORRECTIVE RANDOMIZER-ENCRYPTOR SYSTEM AND METHOD[2003/14]
French:SYSTEME ET METHODE DE RANDOMISATION-CHIFFREMENT AUTOCORRECTEUR[2002/09]
Former [2002/09]SELBSTKORRIGIERENDES VERSCHLEIERUNGS-UNDVERSCHLÜSSELUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN
Former [2002/09]SELF-CORRECTOR RANDOMIZER-ENCRYPTOR SYSTEM AND METHOD
Entry into regional phase14.11.2001Translation filed 
14.11.2001National basic fee paid 
14.11.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/09]
08.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2003Fee for grant paid
30.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.10.2003
FI01.10.2003
IT01.10.2003
NL01.10.2003
CY27.10.2003
DK01.01.2004
GR01.01.2004
SE01.01.2004
PT01.03.2004
[2008/18]
Former [2004/41]AT01.10.2003
FI01.10.2003
NL01.10.2003
CY27.10.2003
DK01.01.2004
GR01.01.2004
SE01.01.2004
Former [2004/36]AT01.10.2003
FI01.10.2003
NL01.10.2003
CY27.10.2003
GR01.01.2004
SE01.01.2004
Former [2004/33]AT01.10.2003
FI01.10.2003
NL01.10.2003
GR01.01.2004
SE01.01.2004
Former [2004/31]AT01.10.2003
FI01.10.2003
SE01.01.2004
Former [2004/26]FI01.10.2003
SE01.01.2004
Former [2004/24]SE01.01.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]US5608800  (HOFFMANN GERHARD [DE], et al);
 [A]US5220606  (GREENBERG HAROLD [US]);
 [A]EP0676876  (IBM [US]);
 [A]EP0624013  (LIU ZUNQUAN [US])