Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1054033

EP1054033 - EXTRUSION-FOAMED BOARD OF RESIN BLEND COMPRISING MODIFIED POLYPROPYLENE RESIN AND POLYSTYRENE RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.11.2004
Database last updated on 19.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Miyama, Osamu
6-704 Misawa-cho
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0862 / JP
02 / Tomita, Haruo
28-1 Tainohatahigashimachi, Suma-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 654-0134 / JP
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/47]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99954443.009.11.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999JP06221
Priority number, dateJP1998032081811.11.1998         Original published format: JP 32081898
JP1999002095829.01.1999         Original published format: JP 2095899
[2000/47]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0027906
Date:18.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1054033
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000
[2000/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.05.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:C08J9/12, C08J9/00
[2003/27]
Former International [2000/47]C08J9/12
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB [2000/47]
TitleGerman:EXTRUSIONSGESCHÄUMTE PLATTE AUS POLYPROPYLEN UND POLYSTYROL ENTHALTENDEM MODIFIZIERTEM HARZBLEND[2000/47]
English:EXTRUSION-FOAMED BOARD OF RESIN BLEND COMPRISING MODIFIED POLYPROPYLENE RESIN AND POLYSTYRENE RESIN[2000/47]
French:PANNEAU EXPANSE PAR EXTRUSION CONSTITUE D'UN MELANGE DE RESINES COMPRENANT UNE RESINE DE POLYPROPYLENE ET UNE RESINE DE POLYSTYRENE MODIFIEES[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase10.08.2000Translation filed 
10.08.2000National basic fee paid 
10.08.2000Search fee paid 
10.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
26.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
02.11.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/53]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4020025  (ZEITLER GERHARD, et al) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 24 * * column 3, line 46 - line 47 * * claim 2 *;
 [A]EP0585148  (ASTRO VALCOUR INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 2, lines 8,9 * * page 3, line 3 * * page 3, line 42 *
International search[X]JPH0649261  (SHOWA DENKO KK);
 [X]JPS62174237  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND);
 [XP]JPH1180401  (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK);
 [Y]JPH1024436  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND)