Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1121678

EP1121678 - FLIGHT PLAN INTENT ALERT SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universal Avionics Systems Corporation
3260 East Universal Way
Tucson, AZ 85706 / US
[2001/32]
Inventor(s)01 / NAIMER, Hubert, L.
Nuvola Bianca
CH-6612 Ascona / CH
02 / KROHN, Patrick, G.
975 Mountain Park Boulevard S.W.
Issaquah, WA 98027 / US
03 / GLAZE, Patrick, K.
33542 N.E. Stossel Creek Way
Duvall, WA 98019 / US
 [2001/32]
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/32]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date99954901.715.10.1999
[2001/32]
WO1999US23911
Priority number, dateUS19980104565P16.10.1998         Original published format: US 104565 P
[2001/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0023967
Date:27.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1121678
Date:08.08.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000
[2001/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1121678
Date:16.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:G08G5/04
[2001/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/32]
TitleGerman:WARNUNGSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM FÜR FLUGPLÄNE[2001/32]
English:FLIGHT PLAN INTENT ALERT SYSTEM AND METHOD[2001/32]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'AVERTISSEMENT RELATIF A UN PROJET DE PLAN DE VOL[2001/32]
Entry into regional phase10.05.2001National basic fee paid 
10.05.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
10.05.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/32]
16.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
15.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.2004Fee for grant paid
16.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.06.2004
BE16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
CY16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
IT16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
LU15.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
PT16.11.2004
[2008/18]
Former [2007/23]AT16.06.2004
BE16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
CY16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
LU15.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2006/47]AT16.06.2004
BE16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/45]AT16.06.2004
BE16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/23]AT16.06.2004
BE16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
Former [2005/22]AT16.06.2004
BE16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/14]AT16.06.2004
BE16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/11]AT16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/06]CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/02]CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2004/52]CH16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2004/51]CH16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0565399  (DASSAULT ELECTRONIQUE) [X] 1-16,18-35,39,41-46,48-53,55,56 * page 2, line 44 - page 3, line 26 * * page 5, line 55 - page 6, line 4 * * page 7, lines 9-27 * * page 7, line 54 - page 8, line 21 *;
 [X]EP0802469  (DASSAULT ELECTRONIQUE) [X] 1-16,18-35,39,41-46,48-53,55,56 * page 1, lines 5-40 * * page 3, line 37 - page 4, line 13 * * page 5, lines 39-47 * * page 10, lines 29-48 * * figures 8A,8B *;
 [X]EP0750238  (HONEYWELL INC) [X] 1-6,19-24,27,29-38,40-42,44,50-56 * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 8 * * column 8, lines 36-44 * * column 11, line 53 - column 12, line 35 *;
 [X]US4646244  (BATEMAN CHARLES D ET AL) [X] 1-6,14,16,18,20-30,32,33,41,42,44,50-53,55 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 51 * * column 8, lines 26-40 *;
 [X]WO9221077  (MARCONI GEC LTD) [X] 1-9,11,12,23-28,33,41,42,44-46,48-53,55 * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 1 * * page 7, lines 1-14 *;
 [A]EP0829823  (PIONEER DESIGN CORP ;PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP (JP)) [A] 17 * page 1, lines 14-37 * * figure 7 *;
 [A]EP0826946  (SEXTANT AVIONIQUE) [A] 1-56 * column 2, lines 18-42 *