Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1047717

EP1047717 - PROCESS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS; POLYETHYLENES, AND FILMS AND ARTICLES PRODUCED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.03.2005
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
04.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY
100 North Eastman Road
Kingsport TN 37660 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY
100 North Eastman Road
Kingsport, TN 37660 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FORD, Randal, Ray
3013 Latonia
Longview, TX 75605-1505 / US
02 / STUART, Richard, Kingsley, Jr.
719 Oakwood Drive
Longview, TX 75604-3112 / US
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Best, Michael
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/33]Best, Michael
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/44]Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date99954979.314.10.1999
[2000/44]
WO1999US24240
Priority number, dateUS19980105786P27.10.1998         Original published format: US 105786 P
US1999038654731.08.1999         Original published format: US 386547
[2000/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0024790
Date:04.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1047717
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2000
[2000/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1047717
Date:27.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08F10/00
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/44]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR POLYMERISIERUNG VON OLEFINE; POLYETHYLENE, UND FILME, UND GEGENSTÄNDE DAMIT HERGESTELLT[2000/44]
English:PROCESS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS; POLYETHYLENES, AND FILMS AND ARTICLES PRODUCED THEREFROM[2000/44]
French:TECHNIQUE DE POLYMERISATION D'OLEFINES, NOUVEAUX POLYETHYLENES, FILMS ET ARTICLES PRODUITS A L'AIDE DE CES POLYETHYLENES[2000/44]
Entry into regional phase19.06.2000National basic fee paid 
19.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
10.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2005Fee for grant paid
24.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05000815.0  / EP1522544
EP07008240.9  / EP1860127
EP10010550.1  / EP2277922
EP10010551.9  / EP2277923
EP10010552.7  / EP2277924
EP10010553.5  / EP2277925
EP10010560.0  / EP2275455
EP10010561.8  / EP2287211
EP10010562.6  / EP2275456
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.01.2006  08.02.2006  ADMISSIBLE
THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
2030 Dow Center
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
Opponent's representative
V.O., et al
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
 [2015/48]
Former [2006/15]
Opponent(s)01  27.01.2006  08.02.2006  ADMISSIBLE
THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
2030 Dow Center
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
Opponent's representative
Marsman, Hermanus Antonius M., et al
Vereenigde Postbus 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
Former [2006/12]
Opponent(s)01  27.01.2006   
THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
2030 Dow Center
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
Opponent's representative
de Jong, Nicolaas Henricus Maria, et al
Dow Benelux B.V. Patent Department Herbert H. Dowweg 5
4542 NM Hoek / NL
06.03.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.11.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
09.03.2010Reply to a communication from the opposition division
14.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
02.09.2011Reply to a communication from the opposition division
18.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
17.08.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.08.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition27.10.2017Appeal received No.  T2425/17
22.12.2017Statement of grounds filed
27.10.2017Appeal received No.  T2425/17
21.12.2017Statement of grounds filed
20.11.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.04.2005
BE27.04.2005
CH27.04.2005
FI27.04.2005
IT27.04.2005
LI27.04.2005
NL27.04.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
ES07.08.2005
PT10.10.2005
CY14.10.2005
IE14.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
[2008/18]
Former [2007/23]AT27.04.2005
BE27.04.2005
CH27.04.2005
FI27.04.2005
LI27.04.2005
NL27.04.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
ES07.08.2005
PT10.10.2005
CY14.10.2005
IE14.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
Former [2006/49]AT27.04.2005
BE27.04.2005
CH27.04.2005
FI27.04.2005
LI27.04.2005
NL27.04.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
ES07.08.2005
PT10.10.2005
IE14.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
Former [2006/30]AT27.04.2005
BE27.04.2005
CH27.04.2005
FI27.04.2005
LI27.04.2005
NL27.04.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
ES07.08.2005
PT10.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
Former [2006/22]AT27.04.2005
BE27.04.2005
CH27.04.2005
FI27.04.2005
LI27.04.2005
NL27.04.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
ES07.08.2005
PT10.10.2005
Former [2006/14]AT27.04.2005
BE27.04.2005
CH27.04.2005
FI27.04.2005
LI27.04.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
ES07.08.2005
PT10.10.2005
Former [2006/13]AT27.04.2005
BE27.04.2005
FI27.04.2005
DK27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
Former [2005/52]FI27.04.2005
SE27.07.2005
Former [2005/50]SE27.07.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]JPS497075B  ;
 [DA]EP0730246  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO) [DA] 1-4,9-22,27-31,34-47 * page 4, line 51 - page 4, line 53; claim 1 *;
 [X]FR1180416  (PETROCHEMICALS LTD.) [X] 1-6,9-24,27-47 * column 1, line 1 - column 1, line 30; example 4 *;
 [A]US4695558  (ALBIZZATI ENRICO ET AL) [A] 1-6,9-24,27-47
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1974-18650v, XP002129140 & JPS497075B B1 19740218 (NIPON CHEM. IND. LTD.) [X] 1-4,9-22,27-31,34-47 * abstract *