Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1047717 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1047717



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1851
17.12.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.12.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.12.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
09.12.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
04.12.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
27.05.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
21.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.05.2019 Claims Appeal 5
21.05.2019 Claims Appeal 4
21.05.2019 Claims Appeal 5
21.05.2019 Claims Appeal 3
21.05.2019 Claims Appeal 3
21.05.2019 Claims Appeal 3
21.05.2019 Claims Appeal 4
21.05.2019 Claims Appeal 3
21.05.2019 Claims Appeal 3
21.05.2019 Claims Appeal 5
21.05.2019 Claims Appeal 3
21.05.2019 Claims Appeal 5
21.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
21.05.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 14
08.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.11.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
02.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.11.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
01.06.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.05.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 15
28.05.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.05.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.05.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.05.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 2
28.05.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 2
18.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
18.05.2018 Claims Appeal 3
18.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.05.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 21
18.05.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 35
09.04.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
08.01.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
08.01.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
22.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.12.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
22.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.12.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 22
21.12.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.12.2017 Claims Appeal 5
21.12.2017 Claims Appeal 3
21.12.2017 Claims Appeal 5
21.12.2017 Claims Appeal 5
21.12.2017 Claims Appeal 4
21.12.2017 Claims Appeal 3
21.12.2017 Claims Appeal 3
21.12.2017 Claims Appeal 4
21.12.2017 Claims Appeal 3
21.12.2017 Claims Appeal 5
21.12.2017 Claims Appeal 3
21.12.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
21.12.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 15
07.11.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
07.11.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
02.11.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
01.11.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
27.10.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
27.10.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
27.10.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
27.10.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
27.10.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
24.08.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.08.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.08.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.08.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
17.08.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
17.08.2017 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 11
17.08.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 13
17.08.2017 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.08.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.08.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.08.2017 Means of redress Opposition 2
17.08.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
17.08.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
17.08.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.08.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 14
17.08.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 8
17.08.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.05.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 3
20.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
06.04.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.03.2017 Letter of witness during taking of evidence Opposition 1
27.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.02.2017 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.02.2017 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.02.2017 Letter of witness during taking of evidence Opposition 1
17.02.2017 Letter of witness during taking of evidence Opposition 1
17.02.2017 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.01.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.01.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.01.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.01.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.01.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2017 Decision on the taking of evidence Opposition 2
30.01.2017 Settlement of expenses for witnesses and experts Opposition 2
30.01.2017 Summons to give evidence Opposition 4
30.01.2017 Summons to give evidence Opposition 4
26.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.01.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
20.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.01.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
18.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
18.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
18.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
18.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
18.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
18.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
18.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
18.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
18.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
18.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
18.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
18.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
18.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
18.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
18.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
18.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
18.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
18.01.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 9
18.01.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.01.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
18.01.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
18.01.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.01.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
18.01.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.01.2017 Claims Opposition 3
18.01.2017 Claims Opposition 4
18.01.2017 Claims Opposition 3
18.01.2017 Claims Opposition 4
18.01.2017 Claims Opposition 5
18.01.2017 Claims Opposition 4
18.01.2017 Claims Opposition 4
18.01.2017 Claims Opposition 5
18.01.2017 Claims Opposition 4
18.01.2017 Claims Opposition 3
18.01.2017 Claims Opposition 3
18.01.2017 Claims Opposition 4
18.01.2017 Claims Opposition 5
18.01.2017 Claims Opposition 3
18.01.2017 Claims Opposition 5
18.01.2017 Claims Opposition 3
18.01.2017 Claims Opposition 3
18.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
18.01.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 17
18.01.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.01.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 18
25.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
27.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
27.10.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 3
12.09.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.09.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.08.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.08.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.08.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
22.08.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
22.08.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.08.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.08.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
22.10.2015 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 2
29.09.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
08.07.2013 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
08.07.2013 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
23.04.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
02.04.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 3
09.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2011 Claims Opposition 5
02.09.2011 Claims Opposition 5
02.09.2011 Claims Opposition 3
02.09.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 20
02.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
02.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
14.07.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
14.07.2011 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
14.07.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.03.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
17.02.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
15.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
10.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
10.03.2010 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 18
09.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
09.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
09.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
09.03.2010 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 18
30.10.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
30.10.2009 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
30.10.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.09.2009 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
19.08.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
14.08.2009 General enquiry Opposition 1
13.08.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
15.06.2009 General enquiry Opposition 1
20.05.2009 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Opposition 1
13.05.2009 General enquiry Opposition 1
23.11.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2006 Claims Opposition 4
15.11.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.11.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 53
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.11.2006 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 19
07.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
04.09.2006 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
01.09.2006 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
17.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
14.07.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
14.07.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
12.07.2006 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
05.07.2006 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
05.07.2006 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.03.2006 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
06.03.2006 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.02.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2006 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
23.02.2006 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
21.02.2006 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
17.02.2006 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
09.02.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2006 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.02.2006 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
02.02.2006 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
02.02.2006 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
02.02.2006 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 9
02.02.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
02.02.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.02.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.02.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 64
02.02.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
02.02.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.02.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
02.02.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
02.02.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
02.02.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
02.02.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
02.02.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 64
02.02.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 57
02.02.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
02.02.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
27.01.2006 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 14
17.03.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.02.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.02.2005 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.02.2005 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
08.11.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
08.11.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
08.11.2004 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.11.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
24.09.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
24.09.2004 Description Search / examination 9
24.09.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.05.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
24.05.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.05.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
10.05.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.03.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.03.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.11.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
10.11.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.09.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.08.2000 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
17.08.2000 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 17
17.08.2000 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 2
03.07.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.06.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
07.06.2000 Urgent incoming letter International Searching Authority 1
12.05.2000 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
12.05.2000 Priority document Search / examination 40
12.05.2000 Priority document Search / examination 54
04.05.2000 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 50
19.11.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
19.11.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 16
19.11.1999 Description International Searching Authority 32
19.11.1999 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1