Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1047717


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
04.12.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
04.12.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.01.2018 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
03.11.2017 Change: Appeal number
03.11.2017 New entry: Appeal number
03.11.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
30.10.2017 New entry: Appeal number
30.10.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
16.08.2017 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
16.08.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.08.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
23.10.2015 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  25.11.2015  [2015/48]
07.09.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition
11.07.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit
11.03.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition
27.10.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit
28.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.04.2008  [2008/18]
04.05.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2007  [2007/23]
18.11.2006 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.11.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2006  [2006/49]
05.09.2006 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
14.07.2006 Change - representative published on  16.08.2006  [2006/33]
08.07.2006 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
23.06.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.07.2006  [2006/30]
14.04.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.05.2006  [2006/22]
02.03.2006 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
24.02.2006 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  12.04.2006  [2006/15]
17.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
10.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2006  [2006/13]
03.02.2006 Opposition filed published on  22.03.2006  [2006/12]
11.11.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2005  [2005/52]
28.10.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2005  [2005/50]
11.03.2005 (Expected) grant published on  27.04.2005  [2005/17]
04.03.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
04.03.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
21.01.2005 Change - divisional application(s) published on  09.03.2005  [2005/10]
03.11.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.10.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.09.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
18.05.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.05.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.03.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.11.2003 First examination report
06.11.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.10.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.10.2002 Renewal fee
18.10.2001 Renewal fee
15.09.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.11.2000 [2000/44]
15.09.2000 Request for examination filed published on  02.11.2000 [2000/44]
11.09.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
28.06.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
22.05.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
10.05.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
08.05.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
01.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
08.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication