Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1047717 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP05000815 EP07008240 EP10010550 EP10010551 EP10010552 EP10010553 EP10010560 EP10010561 EP10010562 EP99951975

More

EP99954979



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7893180Global Dossier 22.02.2011B2
US2008146760 19.06.2008A1
Priority number Date
US84166607 20.08.2007
US10578698 27.10.1998
US91730701 27.07.2001
US38654799 31.08.1999
US46519403 19.06.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7652113Global Dossier 26.01.2010B2
US2003212219 13.11.2003A1
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US91730701 27.07.2001
US38654799 31.08.1999
US46519403 19.06.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR100610968BGlobal Dossier 10.08.2006B1
KR20010024813 26.03.2001A
Priority number Date
US9924240 14.10.1999
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002528575Global Dossier 03.09.2002A
Priority number Date
US9924240 14.10.1999
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4261064BGlobal Dossier 30.04.2009B2
JP2002528574 03.09.2002A
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US9923843 14.10.1999
US38760199 31.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2287211Global Dossier 08.02.2012B1
EP2287211 23.02.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP07008240 14.10.1999
EP99954979 14.10.1999
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
EP05000815 14.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2277925Global Dossier 26.01.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP07008240 14.10.1999
EP99954979 14.10.1999
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
EP05000815 14.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2277924Global Dossier 21.11.2012B1
EP2277924 26.01.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP07008240 14.10.1999
EP99954979 14.10.1999
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
EP05000815 14.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2277923Global Dossier 12.10.2011B1
EP2277923 26.01.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP07008240 14.10.1999
EP99954979 14.10.1999
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
EP05000815 14.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2277922Global Dossier 26.01.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP07008240 14.10.1999
EP99954979 14.10.1999
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
EP05000815 14.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2275456Global Dossier 12.10.2011B1
EP2275456 19.01.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP07008240 14.10.1999
EP99954979 14.10.1999
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
EP05000815 14.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2275455Global Dossier 19.01.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP07008240 14.10.1999
EP99954979 14.10.1999
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
EP05000815 14.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1860127Global Dossier 12.01.2011B1
EP1860127 16.01.2008A3
EP1860127 28.11.2007A2
Priority number Date
EP99954979 14.10.1999
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
EP05000815 14.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1522544Global Dossier 12.03.2008B1
EP1522544 13.07.2005A3
EP1522544 13.04.2005A2
Priority number Date
EP99954979 14.10.1999
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1153048Global Dossier 06.07.2005B1
EP1153048 14.11.2001A1
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US9923843 14.10.1999
US38760199 31.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1047717Global Dossier 27.04.2005B1
EP1047717 02.11.2000A2
Priority number Date
US9924240 14.10.1999
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT294194T 15.05.2005T
Priority number Date
US9924240 14.10.1999
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT299153T 15.07.2005T
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US9923843 14.10.1999
US38760199 31.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9907069 17.10.2000A
Priority number Date
US9924240 14.10.1999
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9914828 11.06.2013B1
BR9914828 10.07.2001A
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US9923843 14.10.1999
US38760199 31.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2314140 04.05.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9924240 14.10.1999
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2348785 04.05.2000A1
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US9923843 14.10.1999
US38760199 31.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1307211C 28.03.2007C
CN1514846 21.07.2004A
Priority number Date
US9924240 14.10.1999
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69924965T 29.09.2005T2
DE69924965D 02.06.2005D1
Priority number Date
US9924240 14.10.1999
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69926083T 12.01.2006T2
DE69926083D 11.08.2005D1
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US9923843 14.10.1999
US38760199 31.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6608152 19.08.2003B2
US2002010292 24.01.2002A1
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US91730701 27.07.2001
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0024790Global Dossier 17.08.2000A3
WO0024790 04.05.2000A2
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0024789Global Dossier 04.05.2000A1
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38760199 31.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2011026612Global Dossier 10.02.2011A
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2004256825Global Dossier 16.09.2004A
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38760199 31.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5685233BGlobal Dossier 18.03.2015B2
JP2012246505 13.12.2012A
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT388967T 15.03.2008T
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT495202T 15.01.2011T
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT528327T 15.10.2011T
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT528328T 15.10.2011T
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT544789T 15.02.2012T
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1174007C 03.11.2004C
CN1324369 28.11.2001A
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38760199 31.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN101012296B 05.09.2012B
CN101012296 08.08.2007A
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CZ20011479 14.11.2001A3
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38760199 31.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69938367T 26.03.2009T2
DE69938367D 24.04.2008D1
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69943137D 24.02.2011D1
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38654799 31.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6291613 18.09.2001B1
Priority number Date
US10578698 27.10.1998
US38760199 31.08.1999
TypeType Divisional application
 EP1522544
 EP1860127
 EP2277922
 EP2277923
 EP2277924
 EP2277925
 EP2275455
 EP2287211
 EP2275456