Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1123313

EP1123313 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF ANEMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AMGEN INC.
One Amgen Center Drive
Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US
[2007/09]
Former [2001/33]For all designated states
Amgen Inc.
One Amgen Center Drive
Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US
Inventor(s)01 / EGRIE, Joan, C.
561 Dos Vientos Drive
Newbury Park, CA 91320 / US
02 / ELLIOTT, Steven, G.
1040 Golden Crest Avenue
Newbury Park, CA 91320 / US
03 / BROWN, Jeffrey, K.
1244 Calle Aurora
Camarillo, CA 93010 / US
 [2001/33]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2018/02]
Former [2001/33]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99955046.018.10.1999
[2001/33]
WO1999US24435
Priority number, dateUS1998017829223.10.1998         Original published format: US 178292
[2001/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0024893
Date:04.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1123313
Date:16.08.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2000
[2001/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1123313
Date:28.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/09]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1123313
Date:10.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/505, A61P7/06, C12N5/10, C12N15/12
[2001/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2018/02]
Former [2001/33]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesAL23.04.2001
LT23.04.2001
LV23.04.2001
MK23.04.2001
RO23.04.2001
SI23.04.2001
TitleGerman:METHODEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR PRÄVENTION UND BEHANDLUNG DER ANÄMIE[2001/33]
English:METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF ANEMIA[2001/33]
French:METHODES ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT DE PREVENIR ET DE TRAITER L'ANEMIE[2001/33]
Entry into regional phase23.04.2001National basic fee paid 
23.04.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
23.04.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.04.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/33]
04.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
22.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2007Fee for grant paid
10.01.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07004087.8  / EP1813624
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.11.2007  05.12.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Wichmann, Hendrik
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/42]
Opponent(s)01  28.11.2007  05.12.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Wichmann, Hendrik
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Former [2008/38]
Opponent(s)01  28.11.2007  05.12.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Wichmann, Hendrik
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68
81675 München / DE
Former [2008/01]
Opponent(s)01  28.11.2007   
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Wichmann, Hendrik
Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Postfach 86 08 80
81635 München / DE
04.01.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.07.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.10.2010Date of oral proceedings
22.12.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.12.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
01.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
20.04.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.04.2017Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.09.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
29.11.2017Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition28.02.2011Appeal received No.  T0524/11
02.05.2011Statement of grounds filed
16.02.2016Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
16.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
29.02.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
[2019/41]
Former [2019/35]AT28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
Former [2019/07]AT28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
Former [2018/40]AT28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
Former [2018/34]NL28.02.2007
Former [2009/32]deleted
Former [2009/02]CY18.10.2007
Former [2008/41]deleted
Former [2008/23]IT18.10.2007
Cited inInternational search[XDA]WO9505465  (AMGEN INC [US]) [XD] 23-32 * claims 1-7,9,17,19,22,23 * * claim 10; tables 3,5,6 * [A] 1-22;
 [XD]WO9105867  (AMGEN INC [US]) [XD] 23-32 * claims 2,5,9,10 *;
 [X]EP0267678  (INTEGRATED GENETICS INC [US]) [X] 23-32 * page 1, line 9 - line 17; claims 1-6 *;
 [A]US5541458  (HIRST B MARK [US]) [A] 1-22,31-37 * column 6, line 14 - line 22 * * column 8, line 14 - line 23 * * claims 5,6,14,15,17-21 *;
 [A]US5716644  (ZALE STEPHEN E [US], et al) [A] 1-22,31-37 * column 1, line 23 - line 48 *;
 [PX]WO9911781  (HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL DE GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 23-31 * claims 1-5,8-10,12,14-19,22 *
 [A]  - FIBI M R ET AL, "N- AND O-GLYCOSYLATION MUTEINS OF RECOMBINANT HUMAN ERYTHROPOIETIN SECRETED FROM BHK-21CELLS", BLOOD, (19950301), vol. 85, no. 5, pages 1229 - 1236, XP002053700 [A] 1-37 * page 1235, last paragraph *
 [AD]  - EGRIE J C ET AL., "The role of carbohydrate on the biological activity of erythropoietin", GLYCOCONJUGATE JOURNAL, Abstracts of XIIth International Symposium, (19930815), page 263, XP000906829

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01209934
 [A]  - ELLIOTT STEVE ET AL., "Structural requirements for addition of O-linked carbohydrate to recombinant erythropoietin.", BIOCHEMISTRY, (19940917), vol. 33, no. 37, pages 11237 - 11245, XP000906783

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00203a020
OppositionEP0640619
    - EGRIE, J.C., "(D1)", BLOOD-JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, vol. 90, pages ABST - 243
    - EGRIE, J.C. AND BROWNE, J.K., "(D2)", NEPHROLOGY DIALYSIS TRANSPLANTATION, vol. 16, pages 3 - 13
    - FISHER, JAMES W., "(D4)", PROC. SOCIETY FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, vol. 216, pages 358 - 369
    - NISSENSON, ALLEN R., "(D6)", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF KIDNEY DISEASES, vol. 38, no. 6, pages 1390 - 1397
    - MACDOUGALL, IAIN C., "(D7)", NEPHROLOGY DIALYSIS TRANSPLANTATION, vol. 16, pages 14 - 21
    - ELLIOT, S. ET AL., "(D8)", EXPERIMENTAL HEMATOLOGY, vol. 36, pages 1573 - 1584