Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1123313 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1123313



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 940
14.12.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
14.12.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
08.12.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
29.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
29.11.2017 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
29.11.2017 French translation of claims Opposition 2
29.11.2017 German translation of the claims Opposition 1
29.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
12.09.2017 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
12.09.2017 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
12.09.2017 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
28.08.2017 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
26.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.04.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
20.04.2017 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 29
20.04.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 1
20.04.2017 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
20.04.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.04.2017 Means of redress Opposition 2
01.12.2016 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
01.12.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.11.2016 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
28.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.2016 Description Opposition 7
20.07.2016 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.06.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
29.06.2016 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
29.06.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.06.2016 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
06.06.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.05.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 19
31.05.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
31.05.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.02.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
29.02.2016 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
21.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.01.2016 Claims Appeal 1
15.01.2016 Claims Appeal 1
15.01.2016 Claims Appeal 1
15.01.2016 Claims Appeal 1
15.01.2016 Claims Appeal 1
15.01.2016 Claims Appeal 1
15.01.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
15.01.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.01.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.09.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 9
17.09.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
30.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Appeal 1
26.03.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
24.02.2015 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
22.10.2012 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
23.09.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.09.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 17
15.09.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.09.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
15.09.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
15.09.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.07.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
11.05.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.05.2011 Claims Appeal 2
02.05.2011 Claims Appeal 2
02.05.2011 Claims Appeal 2
02.05.2011 Claims Appeal 2
02.05.2011 Claims Appeal 1
02.05.2011 Claims Appeal 2
02.05.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 17
02.05.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
02.05.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
02.05.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
02.05.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
02.05.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
10.03.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
03.03.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
28.02.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
30.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.12.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
22.12.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
22.12.2010 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
22.12.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 10
22.12.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
22.12.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
22.12.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
22.12.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
22.12.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
22.12.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.12.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.10.2010 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
14.09.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
25.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.08.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.08.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.08.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.08.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.08.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.08.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.08.2010 Claims Opposition 2
18.08.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
18.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
07.06.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
05.06.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.06.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.06.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
31.05.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
31.05.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.05.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2009 Adjournment of examination/opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2009 Adjournment of examination/opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.03.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
30.03.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
06.03.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
02.03.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
27.02.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.12.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
19.12.2008 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
19.12.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
12.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
16.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 14
14.07.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
14.07.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.05.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.05.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
14.05.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.04.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
04.01.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.01.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
13.12.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.11.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 13
28.11.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
28.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
28.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
28.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
28.11.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 65
28.11.2007 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
01.02.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.01.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.01.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
10.01.2007 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
08.09.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
08.09.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
08.09.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 57
12.07.2006 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
23.05.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.05.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
22.05.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
22.05.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
27.04.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.03.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.02.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.10.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
20.10.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.09.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
14.09.2005 Claims Search / examination 5
14.09.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
25.07.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.07.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.03.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
04.03.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.07.2001 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.06.2001 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
09.05.2001 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.05.2001 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.05.2001 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.04.2001 Annex Search / examination 1
23.04.2001 Claims Search / examination 6
23.04.2001 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.02.2001 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 10
22.01.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.01.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.01.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
22.01.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
22.01.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
22.01.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
22.01.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.01.2001 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.09.2000 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
14.09.2000 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 2
04.08.2000 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.08.2000 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
04.08.2000 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
05.06.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.06.2000 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.05.2000 Document concerning representation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.05.2000 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
23.05.2000 Document concerning representation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.05.2000 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.05.2000 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
12.05.2000 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
12.05.2000 Priority document Search / examination 64
04.05.2000 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 63
19.11.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
19.11.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 6
19.11.1999 Description International Searching Authority 44
19.11.1999 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
19.11.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 9
19.11.1999 Sequence listing International Searching Authority 2