Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1083914

EP1083914 - USING NGALI NUT OIL TO TREAT/RELIEVE THE PAIN OF ARTHRITIS AND OTHER SIMILAR CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/12]TREATMENT OF ARTHRITIS AND OTHER SIMILAR CONDITIONS
[2006/43]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.06.2008
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hull, Peter Hugh
19 Lawson Street
Midge Point, QLD 4799 / AU
[2001/12]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/12]
Representative(s)Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger
Patentanwälte
Wotanstrasse 64
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]Zipse + Habersack
Wotanstrasse 64
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date99955218.501.06.1999
[2001/12]
WO1999AU00426
Priority number, dateAU1998PP0379601.06.1998         Original published format: AU PP379698
[2001/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9962528
Date:09.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1083914
Date:21.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999
[2001/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1083914
Date:08.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU09.12.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/32, A61P19/02
[2006/43]
Former International [2001/12]A61K35/78
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/12]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON NGALI NUSSÖL ZUR BEHANDLUNG/LINDERUNG DER ARTHRITISSCHMERZEN UND ANDERER ÄHNLICHEN STÖRUNGEN[2006/43]
English:USING NGALI NUT OIL TO TREAT/RELIEVE THE PAIN OF ARTHRITIS AND OTHER SIMILAR CONDITIONS[2006/43]
French:UTILISATION DE L'HUILE DE NOIX DE NGALI POUR TRAITER/SOULAGER LA DOULEUR DUE A L'ARTHRITE ET A D'AUTRES TROUBLES SIMILAIRES[2006/43]
Former [2001/12]BEHANDLUNG DER ARTHRITIS UND ANDERER ÄHNLICHER STÖRUNGEN
Former [2001/12]TREATMENT OF ARTHRITIS AND OTHER SIMILAR CONDITIONS
Former [2001/12]TRAITEMENT DE L'ARTHRITE ET D'AUTRES TROUBLES SIMILAIRES
Entry into regional phase29.11.2000National basic fee paid 
29.11.2000Search fee paid 
29.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
29.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/12]
17.01.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2007Fee for grant paid
23.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29]
Request for further processing for:29.11.2004Request for further processing filed
29.11.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.12.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.08.2007
BE08.08.2007
CH08.08.2007
CY08.08.2007
DK08.08.2007
FI08.08.2007
LI08.08.2007
NL08.08.2007
SE08.11.2007
GR09.11.2007
ES19.11.2007
PT08.01.2008
[2010/06]
Former [2008/28]AT08.08.2007
BE08.08.2007
CH08.08.2007
DK08.08.2007
FI08.08.2007
LI08.08.2007
NL08.08.2007
SE08.11.2007
GR09.11.2007
ES19.11.2007
PT08.01.2008
Former [2008/26]AT08.08.2007
BE08.08.2007
CH08.08.2007
DK08.08.2007
FI08.08.2007
LI08.08.2007
NL08.08.2007
GR09.11.2007
ES19.11.2007
PT08.01.2008
Former [2008/23]AT08.08.2007
BE08.08.2007
CH08.08.2007
DK08.08.2007
FI08.08.2007
LI08.08.2007
NL08.08.2007
GR09.11.2007
ES19.11.2007
Former [2008/21]AT08.08.2007
BE08.08.2007
CH08.08.2007
FI08.08.2007
LI08.08.2007
NL08.08.2007
GR09.11.2007
ES19.11.2007
Former [2008/18]AT08.08.2007
CH08.08.2007
FI08.08.2007
LI08.08.2007
NL08.08.2007
ES19.11.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]  BOURKE MICHAEL, "Edible indigenous nuts in Papua New Guinea: Their potential for commercial development.", WANATCA YEARBOOK, (1996), vol. 20, ISSN 0810-6681, pages 37 - 40, XP001088001 [A] 1-11 * see in particular page 38, 5th paragraph - page 39, 1st paragraph *
 [A]  LIM-SYLIANCO C Y ET AL, "MUTAGENIC AND ANTIMUTAGENIC ACTIVITIES IN PHILIPPINE MEDICINAL AND FOOD PLANTS", JOURNAL OF TOXICOLOGY TOXIN REVIEWS, (1985), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 0731-3837, pages 71 - 105, XP001085445 [A] 1-11 * see in particular page 87, 2nd paragraph *
 [A]  SUI L ET AL, "Enzyme polymorphism in Canarium.", SCIENTIA HORTICULTURAE (AMSTERDAM), (1997), vol. 68, no. 1-4, ISSN 0304-4238, pages 197 - 206, XP001083711 [A] 1-11 * see in particular page 197, last paragraph - page 198, 3rd paragraph *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-4238(96)00975-2
International search[A]  - HOLDSWORTH D, "PHYTOMEDICINE OF THE MADANG PROVINCE, PAPUA NEW GUINEA PART I. KARKAR ISLAND", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CRUDE DRUG RESEARCH., LISSE, NL, NL, (19840101), vol. 22, no. 03, ISSN 0167-7314, pages 111 - 119, XP001005947
 [A]  - MARTIN J, HARRIS R, "CHEMICAL CHARACTERISTICS OF CANARIUM SALOMONENSE OIL", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, WILEY & SONS, CHICHESTER., GB, GB, (19930101), vol. 61, ISSN 0022-5142, page 383/384, XP001002565
 [L]  - CATALOG PRODUCT OF LANSONN SKIN CARE THERAPY ANTIOXIDANT, Barcode: 94 19605 00004, Skin care cream with Lanolin and Ngali Nut Oil http://www.titan.co.nz/celtic_holdings/lans on/lansom.htm.,