blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1047841

EP1047841 - PROFILE FOR A TRANSPORTABLE PROVISIONAL PAVEMENT WITH A NON-SKID SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.03.2006
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.03.2006Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawnpublished on 26.04.2006  [2006/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfleiderer water systems GmbH
Ingolstädter Strasse 51
92318 Neumarkt / DE
For all designated states
Event Systems Limited
4-5 Gough Square
London EC4A 3DE / GB
[2005/10]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
Pfleiderer Infrastrukturtechnik GmbH & Co. KG
Ingolstädter Strasse 51
92318 Neumarkt / DE
For all designated states
Event Systems Limited
4-5 Gough Square
London EC4A 3DE / GB
Inventor(s)01 / MAC LEOD, Iain, Mac Kenzie
Littleover
Derby DE3 5HB / GB
02 / LAUBE, Walter
Am Letten 1
D-92318 Neumarkt / DE
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Blaumeier, Jörg
Lindner Blaumeier
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23
90402 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/11]Blaumeier, Jörg
Lindner, Blaumeier & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 119109
90101 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2000/44]Matschkur, Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date99955905.729.10.1999
[2000/44]
WO1999EP08220
Priority number, dateDE199815208912.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19852089
[2000/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0029676
Date:25.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1047841
Date:02.11.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.05.2000
ClassificationIPC:E01C9/08, B29C47/00, B29C47/06
[2000/44]
CPC:
E01C9/086 (EP,US); B29C48/11 (EP,US); B29C48/12 (EP,US);
B29C48/155 (EP,US); B29C48/21 (EP,US); B29C48/307 (EP,US);
B29C48/07 (EP,US); B29C59/08 (EP); B29K2995/0072 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/44]
TitleGerman:PROFIL FÜR EINE TRANSPORTABLE BEHELFSFAHRBAHN MIT RUTSCHFESTER OBERFLÄCHE[2000/44]
English:PROFILE FOR A TRANSPORTABLE PROVISIONAL PAVEMENT WITH A NON-SKID SURFACE[2000/44]
French:PROFIL POUR UNE CHAUSSEE PROVISOIRE TRANSPORTABLE DOTEE D'UNE SURFACE SUPERIEURE ANTIDERAPANTE[2000/44]
Entry into regional phase02.08.2000National basic fee paid 
02.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
02.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/17]
03.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/49]
05.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/17]
14.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/09]
Appeal following examination30.07.2004Appeal received No.  J0019/04
15.11.2004Statement of grounds filed
14.07.2005Result of appeal procedure: rejection of appeal
14.07.2005Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
24.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200204   M06   Fee paid on   24.10.2003
31.10.200507   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US2077749  (FISCHER ALBERT C) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 30; figure - *;
 [A]US4840824  (DAVIS ROBERT J [GB]) [A] 4-10 * abstract ** column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 2; figure -; claims 10,11 *;
 [A]US5190799  (ELLINGSON III CHESTER W [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 48 - line 65 * * column 3, line 16 - line 40; figure 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.