Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1047841 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1047841



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 161
12.05.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
26.05.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
22.03.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.03.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.03.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.03.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
09.03.2006 Closing of application Search / examination 2
05.12.2005 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
25.10.2005 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
25.10.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 18
27.04.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.04.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 8
20.04.2005 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
28.01.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 10
27.01.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.01.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
18.01.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 4
13.01.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 3
08.01.2005 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
08.01.2005 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
02.12.2004 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
01.12.2004 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
17.11.2004 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
16.11.2004 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
15.11.2004 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
30.07.2004 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
16.07.2004 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.07.2004 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
14.07.2004 Decision refusing a request Search / examination 2
14.07.2004 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 5
18.05.2004 Grounds for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 4
17.05.2004 Grounds for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 4
16.03.2004 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 4
03.02.2004 Grounds for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 2
15.01.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
23.12.2003 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
19.12.2003 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
24.10.2003 Annex Search / examination 1
24.10.2003 Annex Search / examination 1
24.10.2003 Annex Search / examination 1
24.10.2003 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 3
01.10.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.09.2003 Closing of application Search / examination 1
05.06.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
05.12.2002 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
20.09.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.08.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
01.08.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
05.06.2000 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
30.05.2000 Priority document Search / examination 10
25.05.2000 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
25.05.2000 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 10
07.12.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
07.12.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 2
07.12.1999 Description International Searching Authority 4
07.12.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 2