All documents: EP1128788  


Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 480
22.11.2013 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
19.11.2013 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
17.09.2013 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
17.09.2013 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
13.09.2013 Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 12
12.09.2013 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
30.08.2013 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
05.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.08.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 14
05.08.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 7
05.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.08.2013 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 4
02.07.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.06.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
18.06.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.06.2013 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
14.06.2013 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
14.06.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 14
14.06.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 14
10.05.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.05.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.05.2013 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.04.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.04.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.04.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.03.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
02.02.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.01.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
24.01.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 7
17.09.2012 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
17.09.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.09.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.09.2012 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
18.08.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
20.06.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.06.2011 Reply to appeal Appeal 3
15.06.2011 Reply to appeal Appeal 3
07.04.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
06.04.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.04.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
07.02.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
02.02.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
31.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
31.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
31.01.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
10.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.12.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
01.12.2010 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
01.12.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 3
01.12.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.07.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.07.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
16.04.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
16.04.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
31.03.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.03.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 16
22.03.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
22.03.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
22.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
22.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
22.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
22.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
22.03.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
09.03.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 16
09.03.2010 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 1
09.03.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
09.03.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
09.03.2010 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
14.05.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.05.2009 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
14.04.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.04.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.04.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
14.04.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
14.04.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.04.2009 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
07.11.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
07.11.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
07.11.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.11.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
09.08.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
09.08.2007 Claims Search / examination 1
09.08.2007 Description Search / examination 6
09.08.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.08.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.06.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.06.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.04.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
11.04.2006 Description Search / examination 6
11.04.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
07.04.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
07.04.2006 Description Search / examination 6
07.04.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
03.01.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
03.01.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.07.2001 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
12.07.2001 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
09.05.2001 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
09.05.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
09.05.2001 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.03.2001 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
23.03.2001 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
08.02.2001 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
08.02.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.02.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
08.02.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.02.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.02.2001 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.10.2000 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
16.10.2000 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
16.10.2000 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
13.10.2000 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
17.07.2000 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.07.2000 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
17.07.2000 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
05.06.2000 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
01.06.2000 Priority document Search / examination 16
25.05.2000 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
25.05.2000 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 21
17.05.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.05.2000 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.05.2000 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
04.05.2000 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3