EP1110048 - BARBECUE LIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grisamore, Greg E. The Ranch, 35241 Mulholland Highway Malibu, CA 91740 / US | For all designated states Gates, James R. 956 Green Oak Lane Glendora, CA 91740 / US | [2001/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99957093.0 | 01.06.1999 | [2001/26] | WO1999US12175 | Priority number, date | US19980100796 | 19.06.1998 Original published format: US 100796 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9966278 | Date: | 23.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1110048 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F27D21/02, A47J37/07, F21V33/00 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
A47J37/0786 (EP,US);
A47J37/0704 (EP,US);
A47J45/06 (EP,US);
F21S4/20 (EP,US);
F21S9/02 (EP,US);
F21V33/008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/39] | F27D21/02, A47J37/07 | ||
Former IPC [2001/26] | F27D21/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/26] | Title | German: | LICHT FÜR GRILL | [2005/11] | English: | BARBECUE LIGHT | [2001/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF SERVANT A ECLAIRER UN BARBECUE | [2001/26] |
Former [2001/26] | ANZÜNDER FÜR GRILL | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 27.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/25] | 03.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2470645 (REICHART JAMES H) [A] 1,3,4,9,12 * column 2, lines 42-53 * * column 3, lines 60-65 ** figure 1 *; | [XA]US5257169 (WALENDZIAK RICHARD W [US]) [X] 1-4,10 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 13; figures 1-3,5,6; claim 1 * [A] 5,6,8,9,12 | International search | [X]US5257169 (WALENDZIAK RICHARD W [US]); | [A]US5664875 (HEGEDUS BARNARD [US]) |