Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1148884

EP1148884 - GRADUATED PROGESTIN CONTRACEPTIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004Change - designated statespublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited
Lincoln House, Lincoln Place
Dublin 2 / IE
[2001/44]
Inventor(s)01 / BOISSONNEAULT, Roger, M.
5 North Bridge Drive
Long Valley, NJ 07853 / US
 [2001/44]
Representative(s)Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/44]Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth , et al
Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date99957497.303.11.1999
[2001/44]
WO1999US25705
Priority number, dateUS1998019014612.11.1998         Original published format: US 190146
[2001/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0028995
Date:25.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1148884
Date:31.10.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2000
[2001/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US25.05.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/56, A61K31/565
[2003/24]
Former International [2001/44]A61K31/56
Designated contracting statesGB,   IE [2004/20]
Former [2001/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verhütungsmittel mit gradiertem Progestin[2001/50]
English:GRADUATED PROGESTIN CONTRACEPTIVE[2001/44]
French:CONTRACEPTIF PROGESTATIF GRADUE[2001/44]
Former [2001/44]VERHÜTUNGSMITTEL MIT GRADIERTEM PROGESTIN
Entry into regional phase20.08.2001National basic fee paid 
20.08.2001Search fee paid 
20.08.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.06.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/44]
15.10.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.05.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
02.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/02]
17.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.07.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2001GB   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2001
24.07.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2001IE   M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2001
24.07.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
24.07.2001M01   Fee paid on   20.08.2001
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US4921843  (PASQUALE SAMUEL A [US]);
 [Y]US5276022  (CASPER ROBERT F [CA]);
 [Y]US5382573  (CASPER ROBERT F [CA]);
 [Y]US4530839  (PASQUALE SAMUEL A [US]);
 [AP]US5898032  (HODGEN GARY D [US]);
 [A]US5340584  (SPICER DARCY V [US], et al);
 [Y]US4390531  (EDGREN RICHARD A)