Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1159327

EP1159327 - METHOD OF PRODUCING DERIVATIVES OF POLYARYLENE VINYLENE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, FR
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Patent GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[2007/02]
Former [2006/15]For all designated states
Covion Organic Semiconductors GmbH
65926 Frankfurt / DE
Former [2002/16]For all designated states
Covion Organic Semiconductors GmbH
65926 Frankfurt / DE
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
Celanese Ventures GmbH
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / VANDERZANDE, Dirk
Parklaan 22
B-3740 Bilzen / BE
02 / GELAN, Joanes
Poreistraat 16
B-3600 Genk / BE
03 / VAN BREEMEN, Albert
Bastenakenlaan 7
NL-5628 XA Eindhoven / NL
04 / VAN DER BORGHT, Michael
Beirenmolenstraat 24
B-2300 Turnhout / BE
05 / ISSARIS, Anna
Haagdoornlaan 17
B-3511 Kuringen / BE
06 / LUTSEN, Laurence
Appartement 16, 65, rue Gustave Fontaine
59210 Coudekerque-Branche / FR
07 / DE KOK, Margreet
Bastenakenlaan 7
NL-5628 XA Eindhoven / NL
08 / KREUDER, Willi
Sertoriusring 13
D-55126 Mainz / DE
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Benz, Jürgen , et al
Merck Patent GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/46]Benz, Jürgen , et al
Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Former [2002/16]Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte Industriepark Höchst Gebäude F 821
65926 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date99958059.017.11.1999
[2001/49]
WO1999EP08830
Priority number, dateDE199815766115.12.1998         Original published format: DE 19857661
[2001/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0035987
Date:22.06.2000
Language:DE
[2000/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1159327
Date:05.12.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000
[2001/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1159327
Date:12.04.2006
Language:DE
[2006/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08G61/02, C08G61/12
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DERIVATEN DES POLYARYLENVINYLEN[2001/49]
English:METHOD OF PRODUCING DERIVATIVES OF POLYARYLENE VINYLENE[2001/49]
French:PROCEDE POUR PREPARER DES DERIVES DE VINYLENE DE POLYARYLENE[2001/49]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2001National basic fee paid 
16.07.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/49]
21.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
31.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2006Fee for grant paid
03.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
FR12.04.2006
GB12.04.2006
IE12.04.2006
IT12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
GR13.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
AT17.11.2006
LU17.11.2006
BE30.11.2006
CH30.11.2006
LI30.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/36]FI12.04.2006
GB12.04.2006
IE12.04.2006
IT12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
GR13.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
AT17.11.2006
LU17.11.2006
BE30.11.2006
CH30.11.2006
LI30.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2008/21]FI12.04.2006
GB12.04.2006
IE12.04.2006
IT12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
GR13.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
AT17.11.2006
BE30.11.2006
CH30.11.2006
LI30.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2008/18]FI12.04.2006
GB12.04.2006
IE12.04.2006
IT12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
AT17.11.2006
BE30.11.2006
CH30.11.2006
LI30.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2007/31]FI12.04.2006
GB12.04.2006
IE12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/23]FI12.04.2006
IE12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/02]FI12.04.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
Former [2006/50]SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
Former [2006/49]SE12.07.2006
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0705857  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * page 8, line 19 - line 20 * * page 10, line 13 * [Y] 1-5;
 [A]WO9115534  (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 23, line 24 *;
 [A]US4766198  (HARPER KEVIN [GB], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 4, line 63 - line 64 *
 [Y]  - ISSARIS A ET AL, "Polymerization of a p-quinodimethane derivative to a precursor of poly(p-phenylene vinylene)--indications for a free radical mechanism", POLYMER,GB,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, (19970501), vol. 38, no. 10, ISSN 0032-3861, pages 2571 - 2574, XP004059760 [Y] 1-5 * Seite 2571, Spalte 2, Zeile 23 - Zeile 26 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0032-3861(96)00468-5
 [A]  - VANDERZANDE D J ET AL, "A GENERAL APPROACH TO PRECURSORS FOR POLY(ARYLENE VINYLENE) DERIVATIVES: MECHANISM, SCOPE AND MODIFICATIONS", MACROMOLECULAR SYMPOSIA,DE,WILEY VCH, WEINHEIM, (19980101), vol. 125, ISSN 1022-1360, pages 189 - 203, XP000738960 [A] 1-5 * page 195; table II *