EP1062670 - METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING AN OPTICAL ARRAY COMPRISING COAXIAL SHELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGENCE SPATIALE EUROPEENNE 8-10, rue Mario-Nikis 75738 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | For all designated states Université de Liège 7, Place du XX Août 4000 Liège / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states AGENCE SPATIALE EUROPEENNE 8-10, rue Mario Nikis F-75738 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | ||
For all designated states Université de Liège 7, Place du XX Août B-4000 Liège / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAINE, Robert Van Duivenvoordelaan 26 NL-2241 St Wassenaar / NL | 02 /
PELLETIER DE CHAMBURE, Daniel Stevinstraat 169 NL-2287 Ee Den Haag / NL | 03 /
JAMAR, Claude Rue Houssales 46 B-4550 Saint Severin / BE | 04 /
COLLETTE, Jean-Paul Avenue Eugène Ysaye 16A B-4053 Embourg / BE | 05 /
STOCKMAN, Yvan Chavée Des Loups 7b B-4280 Hannut / BE | 06 /
TOCK, Jean-Philippe 237 Chemin de la Ramaz B-01630 Sergy / BE | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Jacquard, Philippe Jean-Luc, et al Cabinet ORES 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Jacquard, Philippe Jean-Luc, et al CABINET ORES, 6, Avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99958321.4 | 14.12.1999 | [2000/52] | WO1999FR03129 | Priority number, date | FR19990000085 | 07.01.1999 Original published format: FR 9900085 | [2000/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0041186 | Date: | 13.07.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1062670 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1062670 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G21K1/06 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
G21K1/06 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49771 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ZUSAMMENSTELLEN EINER OPTISCHEN EINHEIT MIT KOAXIALEN SCHALEN, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN RÖNTGENTELESKOP | [2002/45] | English: | METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING AN OPTICAL ARRAY COMPRISING COAXIAL SHELLS | [2000/52] | French: | PROCEDE D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UN ENSEMBLE OPTIQUE COMPRENANT DES COQUILLES COAXIALES, NOTAMMENT POUR TELESCOPE A RAYONS X | [2000/52] |
Former [2000/52] | VERFAHREN ZUM ZUSAMMENSTELLEN EINER OPTISCHEN EINHEIT MIT KOAXIALEN SCHALEN, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN RÖNTGENMIKROSKOP | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 08.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 26.03.2003 | IE | 26.03.2003 | PT | 26.06.2003 | SE | 26.06.2003 | CY | 14.12.2003 | LU | 14.12.2003 | [2005/23] |
Former [2004/36] | GR | 26.03.2003 | |
IE | 26.03.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
CY | 14.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | GR | 26.03.2003 | |
IE | 26.03.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | GR | 26.03.2003 | |
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | GR | 26.03.2003 | |
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GR | 26.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4936472 (MEIER HANS-JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1-9* column 5, line 26 - column 7, line 12; figures 4,7,8 *; | [DA] - CHAMBURE D DE ET AL, "PRODUCING THE X-RAY MIRRORS FOR ESA S XMM SPACECRAFT", ESA BULLETIN, (19970201), no. 89, pages 68 - 79, XP000691051 [DA] 1-9 * the whole document * | [DA] - D. DE CHAMBURE ET AL., "The status of the X-ray mirror production for the ESA XMM spacecraft", SPIE PROCEEDINGS, (1996), vol. 2808, pages 362 - 375, XP002106458 [DA] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - HARVEY J E ET AL, "IMAGE DEGRADATION DUE TO ASSEMBLY AND ALIGNMENT ERRORS IN CONICAL FOIL X-RAY TELESCOPES", OPTICAL ENGINEERING, (19961001), vol. 35, no. 10, pages 3037 - 3046, XP000634387 [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0003] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.600954 |