Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053654

EP1053654 - METHOD FOR RECONNECTION OF A DROPPED CALL IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.03.2008
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong
Paldal-ku
Suwon-shi
Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2007/18]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-ku Suwon-shi
Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-ku
Suwon-shi, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / HAM, Seok-Jin
c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD
P.O. Box 32 - 463-050 Pundang / KR
02 / CHUN, Kyung-Joon
89, Oryun-dong
Songpa-gu, Seoul 138-151 / KR
03 / KIM, Nak-Koo, Ahreummaeul Pungrim
Apt. 503-802, Immae-dong, Puntang-gu
Songnam-shi, Kyonggi-do 463-060 / KR
 [2001/06]
Former [2000/47]01 / HAM, Seok-Jin
150, Munjong 2-dong
Songpa-gu, Seoul 138-202 / KR
02 / CHUN, Kyung-Joon
89, Oryun-dong
Songpa-gu, Seoul 138-151 / KR
03 / KIM, Nak-Koo, Ahreummaeul Pungrim
Apt. 503-802, Immae-dong, Puntang-gu
Songnam-shi, Kyonggi-do 463-060 / KR
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99958505.203.12.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999KR00733
Priority number, dateKR1952007609803.12.1998         Original published format: KR 5276098
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0033595
Date:08.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1053654
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2000
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1053654
Date:02.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/18]
Search report(s)International search reportAT08.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38, H04Q3/78, H04M1/27, H04M3/42
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2004/21]
Former [2000/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERVERBINDUNG EINES UNTERBROCHENEN RUFES IN EINEM MOBILEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2000/47]
English:METHOD FOR RECONNECTION OF A DROPPED CALL IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2000/47]
French:RECONNEXION D'APPEL INTERROMPU DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase03.08.2000National basic fee paid 
03.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
03.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
12.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2007Fee for grant paid
16.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.02.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
28.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0526240  (NEC CORP [JP]);
 [A]US5664007  (SAMADI BEHROKH [US], et al);
 [A]WO9428689  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE])