Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1131096

EP1131096 - ANTI-CD20 ANTIBODY TREATMENT OF PATIENTS RECEIVING BMT OR PBSC TRANSPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/37]CHIMERIC ANTI-CD20 ANTIBODY TREATMENT OF PATIENTS RECEIVING BMT OR PBSC TRANSPLANTS
[2009/07]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.11.2010
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.12.2010  [2010/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biogen Idec Inc.
14 Cambridge Center
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
[2010/01]
Former [2006/09]For all designated states
Biogen Idec Inc.
14 Cambridge Center
Cambridge MA 02142 / US
Former [2001/37]For all designated states
IDEC PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION
11011 Torreyana Road
San Diego, CA 92121-1104 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GRILLO-LOPEZ, Antonio, J.
P.O. Box 3797
Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US
02 / LEONARD, John, E.
3440 Camino Alegre
Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US
 [2001/37]
Representative(s)Walton, Seán Malcolm , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/36]Walton, Seán Malcolm , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [2001/37]Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas , et al
Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Application number, filing date99958649.809.11.1999
[2001/37]
WO1999US24012
Priority number, dateUS19980107657P09.11.1998         Original published format: US 107657 P
[2001/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0027433
Date:18.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1131096
Date:12.09.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000
[2001/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1131096
Date:06.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.05.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, A61K39/00, A61K35/02
[2002/12]
Former International [2001/37]A61K39/395, A61K39/00, A01N63/00, A01N1/02, A01N1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG VON PATIENTEN DIE EINE KNOCHENMARKTRANSPLANTATION ODER EINE TRANSPLANTATION PERIPHERER BLUTSTAMMZELLEN ERHALTEN MIT ANTI-CD20 ANTIKÖRPERN[2009/07]
English:ANTI-CD20 ANTIBODY TREATMENT OF PATIENTS RECEIVING BMT OR PBSC TRANSPLANTS[2009/07]
French:TRAITEMENT PAR ANTICORPS ANTI-CD20, DE PATIENTS RECEVEURS DE GREFFES DE MOELLE OSSEUSE OU DE CELLULES SOUCHES DE SANG PERIPHERIQUE[2009/07]
Former [2001/37]BEHANDLUNG VON PATIENTEN DIE EINE KNOCHENMARKTRANSPLANTATION ODER EINE TRANSPLANTATION PERIPHERER BLUTSTAMMZELLEN ERHALTEN MIT CHIMÄREN ANTI-CD20 ANTIKÖRPERN
Former [2001/37]CHIMERIC ANTI-CD20 ANTIBODY TREATMENT OF PATIENTS RECEIVING BMT OR PBSC TRANSPLANTS
Former [2001/37]TRAITEMENT PAR ANTICORPS CHIMERE ANTI-CD20, DE PATIENTS RECEVEURS DE GREFFES DE MOELLE OSSEUSE OU DE CELLULES SOUCHES DE SANG PERIPHERIQUE
Entry into regional phase08.05.2001National basic fee paid 
08.05.2001Search fee paid 
08.05.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
08.05.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
08.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/37]
21.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.07.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
11.09.2009Fee for grant paid
11.09.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.10.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/50]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
11.09.2009Request for further processing filed
11.09.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.09.2009Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
25.09.2008Request for further processing filed
25.09.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.10.2008Decision despatched
07.11.2005Request for further processing filed
07.11.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.11.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
27.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
25.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
25.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200103   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.2002
Documents cited:Search[XD]  - MCLAUGHLIN P ET AL, "Rituximab chimeric anti-CD20 monoclonal antibody therapy for relapsed indolent lymphoma: half of patients respond to a four-dose treatment program.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (1998 AUG) 16 (8) 2825-33., XP001027531 [XD] 1-6 * the whole document *
 [PYD]  - JANAKIRAMAN, N. (1) ET AL, "Rituximab: Correlation between effector cells and clinical activity in NHL.", BLOOD, (NOV. 15, 1998) VOL. 92, NO. 10 SUPPL. 1 PART 1-2, PP. 337A. MEETING INFO.: 40TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY MIAMI BEACH, FLORIDA, USA DECEMBER 4-8, 1998 THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEAMATOLOGY., XP001009992 [PYD] 1-6 * the whole document *
 [PYD]  - MCLAUGHLIN, P. (1) ET AL, "Efficacy controls and long-term follow-up of patients (PTS) treated with rituximab for relapsed or refractory, low-grade or follicular (R-LG/F) NHL.", BLOOD, (NOV. 15, 1998) VOL. 92, NO. 10 SUPPL. 1 PART 1-2, PP. 414A -415A. MEETING INFO.: 40TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY MIAMI BEACH, FLORIDA, USA DECEMBER 4-8, 1998 THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEAMATOLOGY., XP000952700 [PYD] 1-6 * the whole document *
 [PY]  - ROTTENBURGER, CHRISTOF ET AL, "Clonotypic CD20+ and CD19+ B cells in peripheral blood of patients with multiple myeloma post high-dose therapy and peripheral blood stem cell transplantation", BR. J. HAEMATOL. (1999), 106(2), 545-552, XP001038308 [PY] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2141.1999.01548.x
International search[Y]US5736137  (ANDERSON DARRELL R [US], et al)
Examination   - FLINN ET AL, BIOL BLOOD MARROW TRANSPL, (2000), vol. 6, pages 628 - 632
    - KHOURI ET AL, BLOOD, (2001), vol. 98, no. 13, pages 3595 - 3599
    - MANGEL ET AL, SEMINARS IN ONCOLOGY, (2002), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 56 - 69
    - BIERMAN ET AL, "High-dose therapy with autologous hematopoietic rescue for follicular low-grade non-Hodgkin's lymphoma", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (1997), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 445 - 450