Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1089717

EP1089717 - CHEWABLE ORAL UNIT DOSAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.08.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.10.2004  [2004/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reckitt Benckiser Healthcare (UK) Limited
103-105 Bath Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB
[2002/44]
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
RECKITT & COLMAN PRODUCTS LIMITED
One Burlington Lane
London W4 2RW / GB
Inventor(s)01 / JOLLIFFE, Ian
47 Kingsway
Cottingham, East Yorkshrre HU16 5BB / GB
 [2001/15]
Representative(s)McKnight, John Crawford
Reckitt Benckiser plc Group Patents Department Dansom Lane
Hull, HU8 7DS / GB
[2003/03]
Former [2001/15]Dickson, Elizabeth Anne
Reckitt Benckiser plc, Group Patents Department, Dansom Lane
Hull HU8 7DS / GB
Application number, filing date99959109.210.06.1999
[2001/15]
WO1999GB01851
Priority number, dateGB1998001423402.07.1998         Original published format: GB 9814234
[2001/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0001372
Date:13.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1089717
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000
[2001/15]
Search report(s)International search reportEP24.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/48
[2001/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/15]
TitleGerman:IM MUND KAUBARE DOSIERUNGSFORM[2001/15]
English:CHEWABLE ORAL UNIT DOSAGE[2001/15]
French:DOSE UNITAIRE ORALE A CROQUER[2001/15]
Entry into regional phase31.01.2001National basic fee paid 
31.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/15]
26.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/42]
21.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2148841  (WARNER LAMBERT CO) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 5 - line 21 * * page 2, line 80 - line 94 * * page 2, line 114 - line 125 * * page 3, line 103 - line 122 *;
 [X]EP0308637  (STEPHAN DIETER [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10 * column 1, line 31 - line 53 * * column 3, line 8 - line 34 *;
 [X]DE1965257  (BRANDYSKE STROJIRNY A SLEVARNY) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,10 * column 1, line 3 - line 8 * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 1 * * column 3, line 53 - line 62 *;
 [DA]EP0211079  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *