Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240640

EP1240640 - METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF DRAWN SEALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STOBA AG
Seestrasse 7
CH-9326 Horn / CH
[2002/38]
Inventor(s)01 / GOBY, André
12, rue des Prés
F-68510 Kappelen / FR
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Patentanwaltsbureau Jean Hunziker AG
Schwäntenmos 14
Postfach
8126 Zumikon / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Patentanwaltsbureau Jean Hunziker AG
Schwäntenmos 14
8126 Zumikon / CH
Application number, filing date99959165.421.12.1999
[2002/38]
WO1999CH00618
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0146936
Date:28.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240640
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1240640
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:G09F3/03, B29C47/00, B29C45/14
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/23]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DURCHZIEHPLOMBEN[2002/38]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF DRAWN SEALS[2002/38]
French:PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES FERMETURES DE SECURITE A LANGUETTE TRAVERSANTE[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase15.06.2002National basic fee paid 
15.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
09.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2003Fee for grant paid
08.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT04.06.2003
ES15.09.2003
[2008/18]
Former [2004/03]ES15.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2264463  (ACME SEALS [GB]) [A] 1-5 * figure 3 *;
 [A]EP0908863  (STOBA AG [CH]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *