blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1137525

EP1137525 - INJECTION MOLDING COOLING CORE HAVING A RIBBED CAP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.10.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gellert, Jobst Ulrich
7A Prince Street Georgetown
Ontario L7G 2X1 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2001/40]For all designated states
Gellert, Jobst Ulrich
7A Prince Street
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2X1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/40]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/40]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99959385.807.12.1999
[2001/40]
WO1999EP09601
Priority number, dateCA1998225580007.12.1998         Original published format: CA 2255800
[2001/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0034025
Date:15.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1137525
Date:04.10.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1137525
Date:03.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.06.2000
ClassificationIPC:B29C45/73, B29C33/04, B29C45/72
[2001/40]
CPC:
B29C45/7312 (EP,US); B29C45/73 (KR); B29C2045/7362 (EP,US);
B29K2105/253 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/40]
TitleGerman:SPRITZGIESSKÜHLUNGSKERN MIT RIPPENKAPPE[2001/40]
English:INJECTION MOLDING COOLING CORE HAVING A RIBBED CAP[2001/40]
French:NOYAU REFROIDISSEUR D'APPAREIL DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION POURVU D'UNE COIFFE CANNELEE[2001/40]
Entry into regional phase28.06.2001National basic fee paid 
28.06.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/40]
13.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
23.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2003Fee for grant paid
11.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
IT03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
CY07.12.2003
IE08.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
DK03.03.2004
GB03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
ES14.03.2004
PT03.05.2004
[2008/18]
Former [2005/03]AT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
CY07.12.2003
IE08.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
DK03.03.2004
GB03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
ES14.03.2004
Former [2005/02]AT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
CY07.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
DK03.03.2004
GB03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
ES14.03.2004
Former [2005/01]AT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
CY07.12.2003
GB03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
ES14.03.2004
Former [2004/52]AT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
CY07.12.2003
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
ES14.03.2004
Former [2004/46]AT03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
CY07.12.2003
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
ES14.03.2004
Former [2004/36]AT03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
CY07.12.2003
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
Former [2004/33]AT03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
Former [2004/31]AT03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
SE03.03.2004
Former [2004/26]FI03.12.2003
SE03.03.2004
Former [2004/24]SE03.03.2004
Cited inInternational search[YA]GB1502358  (PIONEER PLASTIC CONTAINERS LTD) [Y] 5,15 * figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 1-17;
 [A]US4238106  (WILLINGHAM WENDELL D [US]) [A] 5,15* column 1, line 31 - line 55; figure 4 *;
 [A]US4655280  (TAKAHASHI KATSUHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-17 * column A; figure 3 *;
 [DXY]US5498150  (CHECK JOHN M [US]) [DX] 1-4,6-11,13,14,16,17 * column 3, line 21 - line 33; figures 3,5 * * column 3, line 37 - line 43; figure 2 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 4 * [Y] 5,15
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.