Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1055051

EP1055051 - CONNECTING CONFIGURATION OF TWO RUNNING DISCS OF AN AXIAL-FLOW TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.06.2004
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.08.2004  [2004/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BMW Rolls-Royce GmbH
Hohemarkstrasse 60-70
61440 Oberursel / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
BMW ROLLS-ROYCE GmbH
Hohemarkstrasse 60-70
61440 Oberursel / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BÖCK, Alexander
Grafrathstrasse 53
D-82288 Kottgeisering / DE
 [2003/16]
Former [2000/48]01 / BÖCK, Alexander
Clauertstrasse 27
D-15806 Zossen / DE
Representative(s)Schmitz, Hans-Werner
Hoefer & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]Schmitz, Hans-Werner, Dipl.-Ing.
Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber & Partner Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date99959393.209.12.1999
[2000/48]
WO1999EP09688
Priority number, dateDE199815755414.12.1998         Original published format: DE 19857554
[2000/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0036279
Date:22.06.2000
Language:DE
[2000/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1055051
Date:29.11.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1055051
Date:20.08.2003
Language:DE
[2003/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:F01D5/06
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/34]
Former [2000/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGSANORDNUNG ZWEIER LAUFSCHEIBEN EINER AXIAL-STRÖMUNGSMASCHINE[2000/48]
English:CONNECTING CONFIGURATION OF TWO RUNNING DISCS OF AN AXIAL-FLOW TURBINE[2000/48]
French:SYSTEME DE LIAISON DE DEUX DISQUES DE TURBINE D'UNE TURBOMACHINE AXIALE[2000/48]
Entry into regional phase21.06.2000National basic fee paid 
21.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
03.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.2003Fee for grant paid
07.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US2614796  (MILLER ERNEST F) [X] 1,3,4 * figure - *;
 [X]US2772853  (WOODWORTH LEE R) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]DE944646  (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG) [X] 1 * figure - *;
 [X]BE537643  (ROLLS-ROYCE LTD) [X] 1 * figure - *
by applicantDE3444586