Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1142996

EP1142996 - MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY AGAINST APOLIPOPROTEIN A-I [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAIICHI PURE CHEMICALS CO., LTD.
13-5, Nihonbashi 3-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0027 / JP
[2009/09]
Former [2001/43]For all designated states
DAIICHI PURE CHEMICALS CO. LTD.
13-5, Nihonbashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP
Former [2001/41]For all designated states
DAIICHI PURE CHEMICALS CO. LTD.
13-5, Nihonbashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP
For all designated states
Miyazaki, Osamu
2117, Muramatsu, Tokaimura
Naka-gun, Ibaraki 319-1112 / JP
For all designated states
Fukamachi, Isamu
2117, Muramatsu, Tokaimura
Naka-gun, Ibaraki 319-1112 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MIYAZAKI, Osamu Daiichi Pure Chemicals Co., Ltd.
Tokai Laboratories, 2117, Muramatsu, Tokaimura
Naka-gun, Ibaraki 319-1112 / JP
02 / FUKAMACHI, Isamu Daiichi Pure Chemicals Co., Ltd.
Tokai Laboratories, 2117, Muramatsu, Tokaimura
Naka-gun, Ibaraki 319-1112 / JP
 [2001/41]
Representative(s)Hartz, Nikolai , et al
Wächtershäuser & Hartz
Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/43]Hartz, Nikolai F., Dr. , et al
Wächtershäuser & Hartz, Patentanwälte, Tal 29
80331 München / DE
Former [2001/41]Hartz, Nikolai, Dr. , et al
Tal 29
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date99959883.217.12.1999
[2001/41]
WO1999JP07106
Priority number, dateJP1998036429522.12.1998         Original published format: JP 36429598
[2001/41]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0037632
Date:29.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1142996
Date:10.10.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2000
[2001/41]
Type: A8 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP1142996
Date:30.01.2002
[2002/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1142996
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.06.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/08, C07K16/18, C12N5/12, C12P21/08, G01N33/53, G01N33/577
[2001/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/41]
TitleGerman:MONOKLONALER ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN APOLIPOPROTEIN A-I[2008/31]
English:MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY AGAINST APOLIPOPROTEIN A-I[2001/41]
French:ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL DIRIGE CONTRE L'APOLIPOPROTEINE A-1[2001/41]
Former [2001/41]MONOKLONALER ANTIKöRPER GEGEN APOLIPOPROTEIN A-I
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase21.06.2001Translation filed 
21.06.2001National basic fee paid 
21.06.2001Search fee paid 
21.06.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
21.06.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/41]
08.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.06.2008
26.05.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
05.06.2008Date of oral proceedings
05.06.2008Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
18.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2008Fee for grant paid
04.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
19.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
30.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]  MARCOVINA S ET AL, "Immunochemical characterization of six monoclonal antibodies to human apolipoprotein A-I: epitope mapping and expression.", JOURNAL OF LIPID RESEARCH, (1990 MAR) 31 (3) 375-84., XP001057022 [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [T]  MIYAZAKI O ET AL, "A new sandwich enzyme immunoassay for measurement of plasma pre-beta1-HDL levels.", JOURNAL OF LIPID RESEARCH, (2000 DEC) 41 (12) 2083-8., XP001057017 [T] 1-8 * the whole document *
International search[X]  - FIELDING,C.J. ET AL., "Molecular physiology of reverse cholesterol transport", J. LIPID RESEARCH,, (1995), vol. 36, no. 2, pages 211 - 228, XP002924322
 [Y]  - FIELDING P.E. ET AL., "Unique epitope of apolipoprotein A-1 expressed in pre-beta-1 high-density lipoprotein and its role in the catalyzed efflux of cellular cholesterol", BIOCHEMISTRY,, (1994), vol. 33, no. 22, pages 6981 - 6985, XP002924323

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00188a030
 [Y]  - GURSKY O. ET AL., "Themal unfolding of human high-density apolipoprotein A-1:implications for a lipid-free molten globular state", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA,, (1996), vol. 93, no. 7, pages 2991 - 2995, XP002924324

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.7.2991
 [YP]  - SPARKS D.L. ET AL., "Effect of apolipoprotein A-1 lipidation on the formation and funtion of pre-beta and alpha-migrating LpA-1 particles", BIOCHEMISTRY,, (199902), vol. 38, no. 6, pages 1727 - 1735, XP002924325

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi981945k
 [A]  - MIIDA T. ET AL., "Mechanism of transfer of LDL-derived free cholesterol to HDL subfractions in human plasma", BIOCHEMISTRY,, (1990), vol. 29, no. 46, pages 10469 - 10474, XP002924326

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00498a007
 [A]  - BEKAERT E.D. ET AL., "Competitive enzyme inhibition immunoassay of apolipoprotein A-1:use of monoclonal antibodies", CLIN. CHEM.,, (1988), vol. 34, no. 6, pages 1030 - 1035, XP000904925