Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053605

EP1053605 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GATING TRANSMISSION IN A CDMA MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.12.2007
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.01.2008  [2008/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong
Paldal-gu
Suwon City, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2007/07]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon City, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon City, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Hyun-Seok
108-13, Sunae-dong, Puntang-gu, Songnam-shi
Kyonggi-do 463-020 / KR
02 / KIM, Dae-Gyun
Kyungnam Apt. 7-dong, 905, Kaepo-dong
Kangnam-gu Seoul 135-240 / KR
03 / AHN, Jae-Min c/o SAMSUNG CO:LTD;9th FL, Samsung Pl
aza 263,Seohyeon-Dong,Pudang-Gu Sungnam-Shi
Kyunggi-Do 463-050 Pundang PO Box 32 / KR
04 / KOO, Chang-Hoi
263, Seohyeon-Dong, Pundang-Gu
Sungnam-Shi, Kyunggi-Do / KR
05 / CHANG, Hoon
Dongah Apt. Ga-dong, 1110, Taechi-dong
Kangnam-gu Seoul 135-284 / KR
 [2001/07]
Former [2001/02]01 / LEE, Hyun-Seok
108-13, Sunae-dong, Puntang-gu, Songnam-shi
Kyonggi-do 463-020 / KR
02 / KIM, Dae-Gyun
Kyungnam Apt. 7-dong, 905, Kaepo-dong
Kangnam-gu Seoul 135-240 / KR
03 / AHN, Jae-Min c/o SAMSUNG CO:LTD;9th FL, Samsung Pl
aza 263,Seohyeon-Dong,Pudang-Gu Sungnam-Shi
Kyunggi-Do 463-050 Pundang PO Box 32 / KR
04 / KOO, Chang-Hoi
124, Imae-dong, Puntang-gu, Songnam-shi
Kyonggi-do 463-060 / KR
05 / CHANG, Hoon
Dongah Apt. Ga-dong, 1110, Taechi-dong
Kangnam-gu Seoul 135-284 / KR
Former [2000/47]01 / LEE, Hyun-Seok
108-13, Sunae-dong, Puntang-gu, Songnam-shi
Kyonggi-do 463-020 / KR
02 / KIM, Dae-Gyun
Kyungnam Apt. 7-dong, 905, Kaepo-dong
Kangnam-gu Seoul 135-240 / KR
03 / AHN, Jae-Min
Pulean Samho Apt. 109-303, Irwonpon-dong
Kangnam-gu Seoul 135-239; / KR
04 / KOO, Chang-Hoi
124, Imae-dong, Puntang-gu, Songnam-shi
Kyonggi-do 463-060 / KR
05 / CHANG, Hoon
Dongah Apt. Ga-dong, 1110, Taechi-dong
Kangnam-gu Seoul 135-284 / KR
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99959962.407.12.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999KR00745
Priority number, dateKR1998005405307.12.1998         Original published format: KR 9854053
KR1999001477124.04.1999         Original published format: KR 9914771
KR1999002239315.06.1999         Original published format: KR 9922393
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0035126
Date:15.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1053605
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2000
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1053605
Date:14.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT15.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/216, H04Q7/20
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2004/20]
Former [2000/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:GERÄT UND VERFAHREN FÜR UNTERBROCHENE ÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM MOBILEN CDMA-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2006/33]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GATING TRANSMISSION IN A CDMA MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2000/47]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'EMISSION INTERMITTENTE DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE CDMA[2006/32]
Former [2000/47]GERÄT UND VERFAHREN FÜR GATINGÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM CDMA MOBILEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM
Former [2000/47]DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'EMISSION A PORTILLONNAGE DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE EN AMDC
Entry into regional phase07.07.2000National basic fee paid 
07.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
20.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2006Fee for grant paid
11.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
28.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[PA]WO9948227  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]);
 [A]WO9637079  (QUALCOMM INC [US]);
 [A]EP0847147  (HITACHI LTD [JP])
ExaminationKR980011381
 US6724740