Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1140658

EP1140658 - CONTAINER FOR DISPENSING FLUID, COMPRISING A PRESSURE CONTROL DEVICE WITH ACTIVATION STEP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 20.01.2016  [2016/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HEINEKEN TECHNICAL SERVICES B.V.
2e Weteringplantsoen 21
1017 ZD Amsterdam / NL
[2001/41]
Inventor(s)01 / VLOOSWIJK, Johannes, Jacobus, Thomas
Meidoornlaan 24
NL-3461 ET Linschoten / NL
02 / VAN DER KLAAUW, Guido, Petrus, Johannes
Elzenhof 28
NL-2382 EV Zoeterwoude / NL
 [2001/41]
Representative(s)Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2001/41]Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date99960037.214.12.1999
[2001/41]
WO1999NL00771
Priority number, dateDE1998222430U16.12.1998         Original published format: DE 29822430 U
NL1999101292127.08.1999         Original published format: NL 1012921
[2001/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0035774
Date:22.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1140658
Date:10.10.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000
[2001/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1140658
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65D83/14, B67D1/04
[2001/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/41]
Extension statesAL16.07.2001
LT16.07.2001
LV16.07.2001
MK16.07.2001
RO16.07.2001
SI16.07.2001
TitleGerman:BEHÄLTER ZUM ABGEBEN VON FLÜSSIGKEIT MIT EINER DRUCKKONTROLLVORRICHTUNG UND AKTIVIERUNGSEINHEIT[2001/41]
English:CONTAINER FOR DISPENSING FLUID, COMPRISING A PRESSURE CONTROL DEVICE WITH ACTIVATION STEP[2001/41]
French:CONTENANT SERVANT A DISTRIBUER DU FLUIDE COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE LA PRESSION MIS EN OEUVRE SUITE A UNE ETAPE D'ACTIVATION[2001/41]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2001National basic fee paid 
16.07.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/41]
06.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2002Fee for grant paid
27.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0349053  (JAICO CV [BE]) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 27; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]FR2689866  (OREAL [FR]);
 [DA]FR2690142  (OREAL [FR])