Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1141221

EP1141221 - STRUCTURED LIQUID DETERGENT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  28.10.2011
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2011Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 30.11.2011  [2011/48]
28.10.2011Change - applicantpublished on 30.11.2011  [2011/48]
Applicant(s)For:AT  BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GR  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
100 Victoria Embankment
London
EC4Y 0DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/48]For:AT  BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GR  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London
EC4Y 0DY / GB
Former [2003/38]For:AT  BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GR  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House, Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
Former [2001/41]For:AT  BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GR  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House, Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Brouwn, Lili Faucia, @Unilever Res. Vlaardingen
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
02 / Flanagan, Mark, @Unilever Res. Port Sunlight
Quarry Road East
Bebington Wirral, Merseyside L63 3JW / GB
03 / Machin, David, @Unilever Res. Port Sunlight
Quarry Road East
Bebington Wirral, Merseyside L63 3JW / GB
04 / Pas Van De, Johannes Cornelis
Unilever Res. Vlaardingen
O. van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
05 / Patel, Dikshika
Unilever Res. Port Sunlight
Quarry Road East
Bebington Wirral, Merseyside L63 3JW / GB
06 / Birker, Paul Johan, @Unilever Research Vlaardingen
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
 [2011/48]
Former [2001/41]01 / Brouwn, Lili Faucia, Unilever Res. Vlaardingen
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
02 / Flanagan, Mark, Unilever Res. Port Sunlight
Quarry Road East
Bebington Wirral, Merseyside L63 3JW / GB
03 / Machin, David, Unilever Res. Port Sunlight
Quarry Road East
Bebington Wirral, Merseyside L63 3JW / GB
04 / Pas Van De, Johannes Cornelis
Unilever Res. Vlaardingen, O. van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
05 / Patel, Dikshika
Unilever Res. Port Sunlight, Quarry Road East
Bebington Wirral, Merseyside L63 3JW / GB
06 / Birker, Paul Johan, Unilever Research Vlaardingen
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Representative(s)Bristow, Stephen Robert , et al
Unilever Patent Group
Colworth House
Sharnbrook
Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/52]Bristow, Stephen Robert , et al
Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB
Former [2008/35]Kan, Jacob Hendrik , et al
Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Former [2001/41]Kan, Jacob Hendrik , et al
Unilever N.V. Patent Department, Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Application number, filing date99961040.530.11.1999
[2001/41]
WO1999EP09377
Priority number, dateEP1998031033616.12.1998         Original published format: EP 98310336
[2001/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0036079
Date:22.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1141221
Date:10.10.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000
[2001/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1141221
Date:17.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/38]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1141221
Date:30.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:C11D17/00, C11D3/37, C11D3/22
[2001/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/41]
TitleGerman:STRUKTURIERTE FLÜSSIGE WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2001/41]
English:STRUCTURED LIQUID DETERGENT COMPOSITION[2001/41]
French:COMPOSITION DETERGENTE LIQUIDE STRUCTUREE[2001/41]
Entry into regional phase07.05.2001National basic fee paid 
07.05.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
07.05.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/41]
09.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2003Fee for grant paid
08.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.06.2004  29.06.2004  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
 02  17.06.2004  12.07.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Stevermann, Birgit
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA VTP Patente
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  17.06.2004  07.07.2004  WITHDRAWN
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Brooks, Maxim Courtney
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle-upon-Tyne
NE12 9TS / GB
 04  17.06.2004  20.07.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Huntsman International LLC
500 Huntsman Way
Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US
Opponent's representative
Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2008/28]
Opponent(s)01  16.06.2004  29.06.2004  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
 02  17.06.2004  12.07.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Stevermann, Birgit
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA VTP Patente
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  17.06.2004  07.07.2004  WITHDRAWN
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Brooks, Maxim Courtney
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
 04  17.06.2004  20.07.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Huntsman International LLC
500 Huntsman Way
Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US
Opponent's representative
Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 9PW / GB
Former [2004/36]
Opponent(s)01  16.06.2004  29.06.2004  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
 02  17.06.2004  12.07.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Stevermann, Birgit
Henkel KGaA, Patente (VTP)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  17.06.2004  07.07.2004  WITHDRAWN
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Brooks, Maxim Courtney
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
 04  17.06.2004   
Huntsman International LLC
500 Huntsman Way
Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US
Opponent's representative
Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Former [2004/33]
Opponent(s)01  16.06.2004   
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
 02  17.06.2004   
Henkel KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Stevermann, Birgit
Henkel KGaA, Patente (VTP)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  17.06.2004   
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Brooks, Maxim Courtney
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
 04  17.06.2004   
Huntsman International LLC
500 Huntsman Way
Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US
Opponent's representative
Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
04.10.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.02.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.10.2008Date of oral proceedings
19.01.2009Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.01.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.05.2011Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.07.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
07.09.2011Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition05.03.2009Appeal received No.  T0589/09
19.05.2009Statement of grounds filed
03.05.2011Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
11.03.2009Appeal received No.  T0589/09
06.05.2009Statement of grounds filed
03.05.2011Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
03.05.2011Date of oral proceedings
13.05.2011Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
CY30.11.2003
LU30.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
IE01.12.2003
DK17.12.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
[2005/03]
Former [2005/02]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
CY30.11.2003
LU30.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
DK17.12.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
Former [2004/41]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
CY30.11.2003
LU30.11.2003
DK17.12.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
Former [2004/39]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
CY30.11.2003
LU30.11.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
Former [2004/36]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
CY30.11.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
Former [2004/31]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
Former [2004/28]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
Former [2004/22]AT17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
Former [2004/16]AT17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
Former [2004/14]AT17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
Former [2004/13]FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
Former [2004/12]FI17.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9109107  (UNILEVER) [A] 1-7,12-16,20-25,29-31,35-43 * 27 June 1991;; claim - * * example - * * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 15 * * page 7, line 15 - page 12, line 31 *;
 [A]US5672580  (DONKER C.B. ET AL.) [A] 1-7,10-31,33-38 * claim - * * example - * * column 6, line 15 - line 23 *;
 [DA]EP0346995  (UNILEVER) [DA] 1-7,12-16,20-25,29-31,35-38 * 20 December 1989;; claim - * * examples 1-93 *;
 [DA]WO9855576  (UNILEVER) [DA] 1-7,10-16,18-25,27-31,33-37,39-42 * claims 1-9,13-15 * * examples 6-8 * * page 16, line 16 - page 32, line 28 *;
 [DA]EP0151884  (ALBRIGHT & WILSON) [DA] 1-3,6,7,10-13,23-25,27-30,33-38 * claims 7,9,27,32-50 * * example - * * page 26, paragraph 3 - page 27, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]US5168325  (YODER-SHORT DALE R) [A] 1,5-9,14,16,17,23,25,26,30,32,38 * table 1 * * column 2, line 42 - line 44 *
OppositionEP0452106
 EP0151884
 WO9109107
 EP0346995
 GB1303810
 WO9205229
 EP0043327
 EP0623670
 DE2748212
 WO9506107