Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1061053

EP1061053 - PRODUCTION METHOD OF ROCK WOOL USING AS RAW MATERIAL GRANULATED MUNICIPAL WASTE INCINERATION ASH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/51]ROCK WOOL USING AS RAW MATERIAL GRANULATED MUNICIPAL WASTE INCINERATION ASH AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF
[2011/15]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.01.2012
Database last updated on 23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.01.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.02.2012  [2012/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NITTO BOSEKI CO., LTD.
1, Aza Higashi, Gonome Fukushima-shi
Fukushima 960-8161 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/51]For all designated states
NITTO BOSEKI CO., LTD.
1, Aza Higashi, Gonome
Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-8161 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NAKAJIMA, Hideo
989-11, Nekona Tomisato-machi
Inba-gun Chiba 286-0205 / JP
02 / YAMASAWA, Atushi
6-27-104, Anagawa 1-chome Inage-ku
Chiba-shi Chiba 263-0024 / JP
03 / KOGI, Yasushi
2533-3, Shimoshizushinden
Yotsukaido-shi Chiba 284-0006 / JP
[2000/51]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/51]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99961355.724.12.1999
[2000/51]
WO1999JP07262
Priority number, dateJP1999000007004.01.1999         Original published format: JP 7099
[2000/51]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0040517
Date:13.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1061053
Date:20.12.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2000
[2000/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.07.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2006
ClassificationInternational:C03B37/00, C03C13/06, B09B3/00
[2000/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/51]
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNHSVERFAHREN EINER STEINWOLLE MITTELS GRANULIERTE GEMEINDE ABFALL VERBRENNTER ASCHE ALS ROHMATERIAL[2011/15]
English:PRODUCTION METHOD OF ROCK WOOL USING AS RAW MATERIAL GRANULATED MUNICIPAL WASTE INCINERATION ASH[2011/15]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE LAINE DE ROCHE A PARTIR DE CENDRES D'INCINERATION DE DECHETS MUNICIPAUX GRANULEES[2011/15]
Former [2000/51]STEINWOLLE MITTELS GRANULIERTE GEMEINDE ABFALL VERBRENNTER ASCHE ALS ROHMATERIAL HERGESTELLT UND VERFAHREN ZUR SEINE HERSTELLUNG
Former [2000/51]ROCK WOOL USING AS RAW MATERIAL GRANULATED MUNICIPAL WASTE INCINERATION ASH AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF
Former [2000/51]LAINE DE ROCHE DONT LA MATIERE PREMIERE SE COMPOSE DE CENDRES D'INCINERATION DE DECHETS MUNICIPAUX, GRANULEES, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIE
Entry into regional phase04.09.2000Translation filed 
04.09.2000National basic fee paid 
04.09.2000Search fee paid 
04.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
25.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/09]
07.10.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2012/09]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.05.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
21.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
19.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
29.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
23.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
22.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[DXY]JPH10273332  ;
 [Y]US4405723  (KAINZNER ADOLF [AT], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 1, lines 14-49 * * column 6, lines 5-27; claims 11,20,25 *;
 [Y]US4720295  (BRONSHTEIN BORIS [US]) [Y] 1-6 * column 1, lines 45-49; claim 1 * * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 32 *;
 [Y]US5472917  (TALLING BOB LARS O [FI], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 1, lines 22-61 *;
 [Y]EP0508589  (ROSTOKER INC [US]) [Y] 1-6 * page 9, lines 32-47; table 1 *
 [DXY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, [DX] 1-5 * abstract * [Y] 6
International search[Y]JPH10273332  (NITTO BOSEKI CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH06192950  (SANSOU KK, et al);
 [YP]JPH11104595  (SINTOKOGIO LTD);
 [Y]JPH0938614  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD);
 [A]JPH08239659  (SANWA KENSHIYOU KK);
 [A]JPH0957229  (NIPPON KOKAN KK);
 [A]JPH0957230  (NIPPON KOKAN KK)