Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1049406

EP1049406 - CARDIAC GATING OF A COMPUTER TOMOGRAPH IMAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.01.2008
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HU, Hui
312 Hillview Circle
Waukesha, WI 53188 / US
02 / KINSINGER, Richard, E.
W349 S4698 Kingdom Drive
Dousman, WI 53118 / US
[2000/45]
Representative(s)Goode, Ian Roy
London Patent Operation
General Electric International, Inc.
15 John Adam Street
London
WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Goode, Ian Roy
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London
WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2000/45]Goode, Ian Roy
GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date99961797.023.11.1999
[2000/45]
WO1999US27858
Priority number, dateUS1998019951125.11.1998         Original published format: US 199511
[2000/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0030539
Date:02.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1049406
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1049406
Date:07.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/10]
Search report(s)International search reportEP02.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61B6/03, A61B6/00
[2000/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   NL [2004/21]
Former [2000/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:HERZSIGNAL-TRIGGERUNG EINES COMPUTERTOMOGRAPHEN[2000/45]
English:CARDIAC GATING OF A COMPUTER TOMOGRAPH IMAGING SYSTEM[2000/45]
French:SYNCHRONISATION CARDIAQUE D'UN SYSTEME D'IMAGERIE A TOMODENSITOMETRE[2000/45]
Entry into regional phase25.08.2000National basic fee paid 
04.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/05]
26.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
16.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2007Fee for grant paid
08.01.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.12.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07]
Request for further processing for:16.07.2004Request for further processing filed
16.07.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.08.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0370341  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,11,21 * column 5, line 22 - column 10, line 13 * * figure - * [A] 2-10,12-20,22-29;
 [XA]US5832051  (LUTZ ANDREAS [DE]) [X] 1,11,21 * column 3, line 66 - column 6, line 67 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 2-10,12-20,22-29;
 [XA]EP0471455  (PICKER INT INC [US]) [X] 1,11,21 * page 7, line 37 - page 9, line 38 * * figures 1,2,4A,B * [A] 2-10,12-20,22-29;
 [A]US5751782  (YOSHITOME EIJI [JP]) [A] 1-29 * column 7, line 17 - column 8, line 31 * * figures 1,2 *