Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1088458

EP1088458 - MULTIPLE SERVICES PER TRIGGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.11.2005
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.01.2006  [2006/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BellSouth Intellectual Property Corporation
Suite 510, 824 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/14]For all designated states
BellSouth Intellectual Property Corporation
Suite 510, 824 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TUCKER, Brenda, N.
2155 River Cliff Drive
Roswell, GA 30076 / US
02 / SCOTT, David, A.
3100 Wyntree Drive
Norcross, GA 30071 / US
 [2001/14]
Representative(s)Johansson, Lars-Erik , et al
Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2
683 40 Uddeholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2005/45]Johansson, Lars-Erik , et al
Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2
683 40 Hagfors / Uddeholm / SE
Former [2002/51]Johansson, Lars E. , et al
Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls Väg 2
683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE
Former [2001/14]Hynell, Magnus
Hynell Patenttjänst AB, Patron Carls väg 2
683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE
Application number, filing date99961884.601.12.1999
[2001/14]
WO1999US28353
Priority number, dateUS19990129116P14.04.1999         Original published format: US 129116 P
US1999032367702.06.1999         Original published format: US 323677
[2001/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0062559
Date:19.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1088458
Date:04.04.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2000
[2001/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q3/00
[2001/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/14]
Extension statesAL09.01.2001
LT09.01.2001
LV09.01.2001
MK09.01.2001
RO09.01.2001
SI09.01.2001
TitleGerman:VIELFACHDIENSTAUSLÖSER[2001/14]
English:MULTIPLE SERVICES PER TRIGGER[2001/14]
French:SERVICES MULTIPLES PAR DECLENCHEUR[2001/14]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2001National basic fee paid 
09.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/14]
27.02.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/01]
05.08.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0578964  (SIEMENS STROMBERG CARLSON [US]) [X] 1,8,16,19,48 * column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 6 * * column 10, line 20 - column 13, line 19 * * column 14, line 12 - line 53 * [Y] 4,6,11,21;
 [Y]WO9750232  (BELL COMMUNICATIONS RES [US]) [Y] 4,6,11,21 * page 6, line 1 - line 16 * * page 11, line 5 - line 9 * * page 11, line 17 - line 27 * * page 15, line 1 - line 19 * * page 17, line 11 - page 21, line 3 *;
 [XY]WO9821899  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,4,6,8,11,13,16,19,21,22,48 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 5 * * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 23 * * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 16 * [Y] 3,10,18,23;
 [Y]WO9844707  (BELL COMMUNICATIONS RES [US]) [Y] 3,10,18,23 * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 14 * * page 5, line 1 - line 32 * * page 9, line 6 - line 22 *