EP1139798 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING HAM PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZIMBO Fleisch- und Wurstwaren GmbH & Co. KG Wasserstrasse 223 44799 Bochum / DE | [2004/15] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Zimbo Fleisch- und Wurstwaren GmbH & Co. KG Harpener Hellweg 16 44805 Bochum / DE | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Zimbo fleisch- und Wurstwaren GmbH & Co. KG Harpener Hellweg 16 44805 Bochum / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIMMERMANN, Reinhold Höher Weg 40 D-58511 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Schneiders, Josef Schneiders & Behrendt PartmbB Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 (Kortumkarree) 44787 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Schneiders, Josef, Dipl.-Ing. Schneiders & Behrendt Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte, Huestrasse 23 (Westfalenbankgebäude) 44787 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 99962232.7 | 07.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999EP09582 | Priority number, date | DE1998159830 | 23.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19859830 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0038542 | Date: | 06.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1139798 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1139798 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/31, A23B4/005, A22C7/00 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
A22C7/0061 (EP);
A23B4/0056 (EP);
A23L13/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SCHINKENPRODUKTEN | [2001/41] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING HAM PRODUCTS | [2001/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PRODUITS A BASE DE JAMBON | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 20.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.04.2004 | FI | 21.04.2004 | FR | 21.04.2004 | GB | 21.04.2004 | IE | 21.04.2004 | IT | 21.04.2004 | NL | 21.04.2004 | DK | 21.07.2004 | GR | 21.07.2004 | SE | 21.07.2004 | ES | 01.08.2004 | PT | 21.09.2004 | LU | 07.12.2004 | BE | 31.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | CY | 21.04.2004 | |
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
FR | 21.04.2004 | ||
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
IE | 21.04.2004 | ||
NL | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
LU | 07.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
FR | 21.04.2004 | ||
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
IE | 21.04.2004 | ||
NL | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
IE | 21.04.2004 | ||
NL | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
IE | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
IE | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
IE | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | GB | 21.04.2004 | |
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 21.07.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]RO1994108526 ; | [A]NL7201989 (UNILEVER N.V.) [A] 1-11 * examples 1,2; claims 1-5 *; | [A]US3987209 (GATINEAU JACQUES ANDRE GUSTAVE, et al) [A] 1-11 * claims 1,6 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 7 * * column 7, line 5 - line 12 * * column 7, line 50 - line 68; figures 7-9 *; | [A]GB2074839 (SCOT MEAT PROD LTD) [A] 1-11 * page 2, line 2 - line 3; claims 1,4,8-10 *; | [A]DE3413295 (LIESAUS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 7; figures 1-3; claims 1-4 *; | [A]EP0438619 (FRISCO FINDUS AG [CH]) [A] 1-11 * page 1, line 24 - line 35; example 1; claims 1,6,7 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 23, Database accession no. 95-176445, XP002131755 & RO108526 A 19940630 (BOICEAN ET AL.) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |