Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1075583

EP1075583 - SHAPED-CHARGE LINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.09.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.11.2005  [2005/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OWEN OIL TOOLS, INC.
8900 Forum Way
Fort Worth, TX 76140 / US
[2001/07]
Inventor(s)01 / PRATT, Dan, W.
2912 Creekwood Lane
Fort Worth, TX 76123 / US
02 / WESSON, David, S.
6366 Elm Crest Court
Fort Worth, TX 76137 / US
03 / ROUSE, John, K.
8121 Granbury Highway
Weatherford, TX 76067 / US
 [2001/30]
Former [2001/07]01 / PRATT, Dan, W.
2912 Creekwood Lane
Fort Worth, TX 76123 / US
02 / WESSON, David, S.
1412 County Ridge Drive
De Soto, TX 75115 / US
03 / ROUSE, John, K.
8121 Granbury Highway
Weatherford, TX 76067 / US
Representative(s)Schmitz, Jean-Marie , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [2001/07]Schmitz, Jean-Marie , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
Application number, filing date99962642.726.04.1999
[2001/07]
WO1999US08933
Priority number, dateUS19980083931P01.05.1998         Original published format: US 83931 P
US1999029568521.04.1999         Original published format: US 295685
[2001/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0012858
Date:09.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1075583
Date:14.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000
[2001/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1075583
Date:10.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/46]
Search report(s)International search reportUS23.11.2000
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP27.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:E21B1/00, F42B1/032
[2002/06]
Former International [2001/07]E21B1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2001/07]
TitleGerman:AUSKLEIDUNG FÜR HOHLLADUNG[2001/07]
English:SHAPED-CHARGE LINER[2001/07]
French:REVETEMENT DU CONE DE CHARGE CREUSE[2001/07]
Entry into regional phase27.10.2000National basic fee paid 
27.10.2000Search fee paid 
27.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
31.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/07]
08.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2004Fee for grant paid
18.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5279228  (AYER DOUGLAS E [US]) [X] 1-3,9-11,17-19 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 18; claim 1 * [Y] 5;
 [X]FR2429990  (SAINT LOUIS INST [FR]) [X] 1,3,8,9,11,16,17,19,24 * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 23 * * page 3, line 20 - line 24 *;
 [X]US3675575  (BAILEY ROBERT A, et al) [X] 1-3,6,8-11,14,16-19,22,24 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 22 * * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 47 * * claim 1 *;
 [X]US5033387  (LIPS HENDRIK R [DE]) [X] 1-3,9-11,17-19 * column 3, line 24 - line 44 *;
 [Y]GB2302935  (WESTERN ATLAS INT INC [US]) [Y] 5 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0694754  (ALLIANT TECHSYSTEMS INC [US])
International search[X]US4966750  (LASALLE JERRY C [US], et al);
 [A]US5656791  (REESE JAMES W [US], et al);
 [AE]US5939664  (KAPOOR DEEPAK [US]);
 [X]GB2257497  (SECR DEFENCE [GB])