Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1135303

EP1135303 - PLASTIC RECEPTACLE WITH LID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  05.10.2007
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2016Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 31.08.2016  [2016/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jokey Plastik Wipperfürth GmbH
August-Mittelsten-Scheid-Strasse 23
D-51688 Wipperfürth / DE
[2001/39]
Inventor(s)01 / BLUMENSCHEIN, Marcus
Wernscheid 8a
D-51709 Marienheide / DE
 [2001/39]
Representative(s)Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Frankenforster Strasse 135-137
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/39]Patentanwälte Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner
Frankenforster Strasse 135-137
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date99963218.512.11.1999
[2001/39]
WO1999DE03605
Priority number, dateDE199815536101.12.1998         Original published format: DE 19855361
[2001/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0032490
Date:08.06.2000
Language:DE
[2000/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1135303
Date:26.09.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2000
[2001/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1135303
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65D43/06
[2001/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/39]
Extension statesLTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KUNSTSTOFFBEHÄLTER MIT DECKEL[2001/39]
English:PLASTIC RECEPTACLE WITH LID[2001/39]
French:CONTENANT EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE COMPORTANT UN COUVERCLE[2001/39]
Entry into regional phase01.06.2001National basic fee paid 
01.06.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
01.06.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/39]
02.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.2002Fee for grant paid
14.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.06.2003  22.05.2007  WITHDRAWN
Superfos A/S
Skimmedevej 10
4390 Vipperod / DK
Opponent's representative
Sundien, Thomas
Zacco Denmark A/S
Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
 [N/P]
Former [2007/26]
Opponent(s)01  10.06.2003  22.05.2007  WITHDRAWN
Superfos A/S
Skimmedevej 10
4390 Vipperod / DK
Opponent's representative
Sundien, Thomas
Zacco Denmark A/S, Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Former [2003/32]
Opponent(s)01  10.06.2003   
Superfos A/S
Skimmedevej 10
4390 Vipperod / DK
Opponent's representative
Sundien, Thomas
Zacco Denmark A/S, Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
19.08.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.02.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
14.11.2005Reply to a communication from the opposition division
24.05.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.06.2007
24.05.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.06.2007Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
27.06.2007Date of oral proceedings
30.06.2007Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2007/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Former [2007/42]deleted
Former [2007/23]CY12.11.2005
Cited inInternational search[DA]DE4422534  (JOKEY PLASTIK WIPPERFUERTH [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4306982  (JOKEY PLASTIK WIPPERFUERTH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 2,4,7 *;
 [A]US4700842  (GRUSIN GERALD M [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 24; figures 1,5,7 *;
 [A]EP0870690  (HK PLASTICS B V [NL]) [A] 1 * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]DE8804303U  (NADLER WERKE) [A] 1 * figure 3 *