EP1057203 - PARTICLE-OPTICAL APPARATUS INVOLVING DETECTION OF AUGER ELECTRONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FEI COMPANY 7451 NW Evergreen Parkway Hillsboro, OR 97124-5830 / US | [2002/44] |
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states Philips Electron Optics B.V. Achtseweg Noord 5 5651 GG Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRIJN, Marcellinus, P., C., M. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HENSTRA, Alexander Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Bakker, Hendrik FEI Company Achtseweg Noord 5, Building AAE-48 5651 GG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/07] | Bakker, Hendrik FEI Company Achtseweg Noord 5, Building AAE-48 5651 GG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2000/49] | Bakker, Hendrik INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 99963356.3 | 01.12.1999 | [2000/49] | WO1999EP09364 | Priority number, date | EP19980204289 | 17.12.1998 Original published format: EP 98204289 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0036630 | Date: | 22.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1057203 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1057203 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/05 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
H01J37/05 (EP,US);
H01J2237/2511 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/38] |
Former [2000/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KORPUSKULARSTRAHLOPTISCHES GERÄT MIT AUGER-ELEKTRONENDETEKTION | [2000/49] | English: | PARTICLE-OPTICAL APPARATUS INVOLVING DETECTION OF AUGER ELECTRONS | [2000/49] | French: | APPAREIL OPTIQUE A PARTICULES IMPLIQUANT UNE DETECTION D'ELECTRONS D'AUGER | [2000/49] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 20.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 15.09.2004 | [2006/14] | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH01264149 ; | [A]FR2104604 (PHILIPS NV) [A] 1 * claims 1-11 *; | [A]US3979590 (ANDERSEN WILLEM HENDRIK JAN) [A] 1 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP0373399 (ZEISS CARL FA [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-11 *; | [A]EP0555911 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1 * claims 1-15 *; | [AD]US5422486 (HERRMANN KARL H [DE], et al) [AD] 1* claims 1-7 *; | [A]DE19633496 (CEOS CORRECTED ELECTRON OPTION [DE]); | [PX]EP0989584 (ADVANTEST CORP [JP]) [PX] 1,6 * column 5, line 24 - line 29; claims 1-13 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900117), vol. 014, no. 022, Database accession no. (E - 874), & JP01264149 A 19891020 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |