Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1149263

EP1149263 - A CHEMICAL HEAT PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.12.2005
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.02.2006  [2006/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Climatewell AB
Instrumentvägen 20
126 53 Hägersten / SE
[2004/22]
Former [2003/35]For all designated states
Solsam Sunergy AB
Instrumentvägen 20
126 53 Hägersten / SE
Former [2001/44]For all designated states
Suncool AB
Box 41
141 01 Norsborg / SE
Inventor(s)01 / JONSSON, Staffan
Bohultsgatan 7
S-691 33 Karlskoga / SE
02 / OLSSON, Ray
Mörby 81
FIN-22240 Hammarland / FI
03 / KAREBRING-OLSSON, Mona
Mörby 81
FIN-22240 Hammarland / FI
 [2001/44]
Representative(s)Bjelkstam, Peter , et al
Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB
P.O. Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2003/35]Bjelkstam, Peter , et al
Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
Former [2001/44]Bjelkstam, Peter
Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date99964915.520.12.1999
[2001/44]
WO1999SE02432
Priority number, dateSE1998000444418.12.1998         Original published format: SE 9804444
[2001/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0037864
Date:29.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1149263
Date:31.10.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2000
[2001/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1149263
Date:16.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE29.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:F25B17/08, F28D20/00
[2001/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/44]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:CHEMISCHE WÄRMEPUMPE[2001/44]
English:A CHEMICAL HEAT PUMP[2001/44]
French:POMPE A CHALEUR CHIMIQUE[2004/22]
Former [2001/44]POMPE A CHALEUR POUR PRODUITS CHIMIQUES
Entry into regional phase30.06.2001National basic fee paid 
30.06.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
02.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/44]
30.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.10.2004Fee for grant paid
23.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE16.05.2005
[2005/48]
Cited inInternational search[A]US925039  (SEAY WILLIAM W [US]);
 [A]DE3029068  (FREILING HEINZ);
 [A]US4383576  (BRICARD ALAIN [FR], et al);
 [A]WO8101458  (GATH N [LU]);
 [A]US4183227  (BOUVIN JACQUES [FR], et al);
 [A]US4694659  (SHELTON SAMUEL V [US])