Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1140184

EP1140184 - COMBINATIONS OF CHOLESTERYL ESTER TRANSFER PROTEIN INHIBITORS AND NICOTINIC ACID DERIVATIVES FOR CARDIOVASCULAR INDICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 11.06.2008  [2008/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
G.D. Searle LLC.
P.O. Box 5110 Chicago
Illinois 60680-5110 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/41]For all designated states
G.D. Searle LLC
P.O. Box 5110
Chicago, Illinois 60680-5110 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SIKORSKI, James, A.
2313 East Royal Court
Des Peres, MO 63131 / US
02 / GLENN, Kevin, C.
509 Princeton Gate Court
Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US
 [2001/41]
Representative(s)Albrecht, Thomas , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/44]Albrecht, Thomas, Dr. , et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2001/41]Weisert, Annekäte, Dipl.-Ing. Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Kraus & Weisert Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date99965035.117.12.1999
[2001/41]
WO1999US27942
Priority number, dateUS19980113955P23.12.1998         Original published format: US 113955 P
US19990142684P07.07.1999         Original published format: US 142684 P
[2001/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0038721
Date:06.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1140184
Date:10.10.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2000
[2001/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1140184
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K45/06, A61P9/00
[2001/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/41]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMBINATIONEN VON CHOLESTERYL ESTER TRANSFER PROTEIN INHIBITOREN UND NICOTINSÄURE DERIVATEN FÜR KARDIOVASKULÄRE INDIKATIONEN[2001/41]
English:COMBINATIONS OF CHOLESTERYL ESTER TRANSFER PROTEIN INHIBITORS AND NICOTINIC ACID DERIVATIVES FOR CARDIOVASCULAR INDICATIONS[2001/41]
French:COMBINAISONS D'INHIBITEURS DE LA PROTEINE DE TRANSFERT DU CHOLESTERYLE-ESTER ET DE DERIVES DE L'ACIDE NICOTINIQUE UTILISEES DANS LE CADRE DE TROUBLES CARDIO-VASCULAIRES[2001/41]
Entry into regional phase29.05.2001National basic fee paid 
29.05.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.07.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/41]
05.09.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2003Fee for grant paid
01.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03012143.8  / EP1340508
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR04.06.2003
[2008/24]
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9409774  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1,2,7,8 * claims 1,6,9 * * page 1, lines 6,7 *;
 [A]JPH04193836  ;
 [A]EP0818197  (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1,6-8 * claim 1 * * page 16, lines 7-14 *
 [A]  - BANYU PHARM, "Treatment agent for hypercholesterolaemia, hyperlipaemia or arteriosclerosis- contains squalene epoxidase inhibitor and other anti-hyperlipaemic agent.", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1992-281671, XP002137557 & JPH04193836 A 19920713 (BANYU PHARM) [A] 1-3,6-8 * abstract *
ExaminationWO9914204