Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099313

EP1099313 - SOFT DECISION DECODING OF A SCHEDULED CONVOLUTIONAL CODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.02.2005
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.02.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.03.2005  [2005/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / STURM, Thomas
Schlüsselbergstrasse 16
D-81673 München / DE
 [2001/20]
Application number, filing date99965391.801.12.1999
[2001/20]
WO1999DE03824
Priority number, dateDE199815545301.12.1998         Original published format: DE 19855453
[2001/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0033467
Date:08.06.2000
Language:DE
[2000/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1099313
Date:16.05.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2000
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1099313
Date:07.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:H03M13/23, H03M13/45
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/15]
Former [2001/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:SOFT-DECISION-DECODIERUNG EINES TERMINIERTEN FALTUNGSCODE[2001/20]
English:SOFT DECISION DECODING OF A SCHEDULED CONVOLUTIONAL CODE[2001/20]
French:DECODAGE A DECISION SOUPLE D'UN CODE DE CONVOLUTION PREDETERMINE[2001/20]
Entry into regional phase16.03.2001National basic fee paid 
16.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
16.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.04.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
13.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2003Fee for grant paid
17.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0391354  (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [X] 1-3,11-14 * the whole document *
 [X]  - JOERESSEN O J ET AL, "HIGH-SPEED VLSI ARCHITECTURES FOR SOFT-OUTPUT VITERBI DECODING", JOURNAL OF VLSI SIGNAL PROCESSING,NL,KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, (19941001), vol. 8, no. 2, ISSN 0922-5773, pages 169 - 181, XP000483302 [X] 1-3,11-14 * page 170, column L, line 8 - page 171, column L, line 28 * * page 172, column L, line 10 - column R, line 9 * * page 174, column R, line 1 - page 176, column R, line 10 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02109383