Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1140521

EP1140521 - ACTIVABLE DOCUMENT AND SYSTEM FOR AKTIVABLE DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  15.07.2005
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 06.06.2007  [2007/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OVD Kinegram AG
Gubelstr.22
6301 Zug / CH
[2001/41]
Inventor(s)01 / TOMPKIN, Wayne, Robert
Oesterliwaldweg 2
CH-5400 Baden / CH
02 / STAUB, René
Schmiedstrasse 6
CH-6330 Cham / CH
 [2001/41]
Representative(s)Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/41]LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH
Postfach 3055
90014 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date99965502.020.12.1999
[2001/41]
WO1999EP10141
Priority number, dateCH1998000255724.12.1998         Original published format: CH 255798
[2001/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0038932
Date:06.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1140521
Date:10.10.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2000
[2001/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1140521
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1140521
Date:31.08.2005
Language:DE
[2005/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:B42D15/10
[2001/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/41]
TitleGerman:AKTIVIERBARES DOKUMENT UND SYSTEM FÜR AKTIVIERBARE DOKUMENTE[2001/41]
English:ACTIVABLE DOCUMENT AND SYSTEM FOR AKTIVABLE DOCUMENTS[2001/41]
French:DOCUMENT POUVANT ETRE ACTIVE ET SYSTEME POUR DOCUMENTS POUVANT ETRE ACTIVES[2001/41]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2001National basic fee paid 
26.06.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/41]
05.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.07.2002Fee for grant paid
03.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.06.2003   
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstr. 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2003/35]
Opponent(s)01  16.06.2003   
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Prinzregentenstr. 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
24.07.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.01.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.11.2004Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.11.2004Date of oral proceedings
24.11.2004Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.12.2004Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.04.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
22.06.2005Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
DK18.12.2002
LU20.12.2002
BE31.12.2002
CY31.12.2002
MC01.07.2003
[2007/23]
Former [2006/44]FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LU20.12.2002
BE31.12.2002
CY31.12.2002
MC01.07.2003
Former [2005/21]FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LU20.12.2002
BE31.12.2002
CY31.12.2002
Former [2004/39]GR18.09.2002
LU20.12.2002
BE31.12.2002
CY31.12.2002
Former [2004/10]GR18.09.2002
BE31.12.2002
CY31.12.2002
Former [2003/20]GR18.09.2002
Cited inInternational search[AD]US3833795  (SHOSHANI A, et al) [AD] 1,8 * column W *;
 [AD]EP0718795  (LANDIS & GYR TECH INNOVAT [CH]) [AD] 1,8 * the whole document *
OppositionUS4686527
 EP0829826
 DE2826469
 US4745267
 US5601931
    - Rankl/Effing, "Handbuch der Chipkarten", 3. Auflage, Seiten 147-171,