Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1159335

EP1159335 - CAPPING OF POLYPHENYLENE ETHER RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2005
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BRAAT, Adrianus, J., F., M.
Krekeberg 17
NL-4708 KR Roosendaal / NL
02 / LANDA, Adrie
Pater Dehonlaan 144
NL-4615 DB Bergen op Zoom / NL
03 / LISKA, Juraj
De Boulevard 136
NL-4617 LZ Bergen op Zoom / NL
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Szary, Anne Catherine , et al
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Szary, Anne Catherine, Dr. , et al
London Patent Operation, GE International, Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date99966047.507.12.1999
[2001/49]
WO1999US29068
Priority number, dateUS1999024525505.02.1999         Original published format: US 245255
[2001/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0046275
Date:10.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1159335
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2000
[2001/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1159335
Date:08.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08G65/48
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/49]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM KAPPEN VON POLYPHENYLENÄTHERN[2001/49]
English:CAPPING OF POLYPHENYLENE ETHER RESIN[2001/49]
French:COIFFAGE DE RESINE DE POLY(PHENYLENE ETHER)[2001/49]
Entry into regional phase05.09.2001National basic fee paid 
05.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
05.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.07.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.07.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/49]
02.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2004Fee for grant paid
13.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
DK08.03.2005
GR08.03.2005
SE08.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
PT08.05.2005
[2008/18]
Former [2007/23]AT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
DK08.03.2005
GR08.03.2005
SE08.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
Former [2006/14]AT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
DK08.03.2005
GR08.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
Former [2006/12]AT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
DK08.03.2005
GR08.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
Former [2005/51]AT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
GR08.03.2005
Former [2005/36]AT08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
GR08.03.2005
Former [2005/26]CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
GR08.03.2005
Former [2005/25]CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
Former [2005/24]FI08.12.2004
Cited inInternational search[XD]US4760118  (WHITE DWAIN M [US], et al) [XD] 1,4-8,10,13-15,17,19 * example 1 * * column 5, line 24 *;
 [X]EP0301233  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,4,6-9,13,14 * example 1; claims 1-3 * * page 3, line 19 - line 20 *;
 [X]EP0534543  (ENICHEM POLIMERI [IT]) [X] 1-3,6-8,13,14,19-21 * example 1 * * page 6, line 30 - line 32 * * page 5, line 15 - line 17 *;
 [X]EP0639603  (ENICHEM SPA [IT]) [X] 1-3,6-9,13,19-21 * example 1 * * page 5, line 30 - line 31 * * page 4, line 10 - line 12 *;
 [X]EP0522767  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,6-9,13,19 * examples 1-3 * * page 3, line 45 - page 46 *;
 [X]EP0501155  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-3,6-9,13,19-21 * examples 1-3 *;
 [X]EP0592144  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 19-21 * page 5, line 25 - line 30 * * page 2, line 57 - line 58 *