Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1140689

EP1140689 - WEDGE CLAMP TYPE TERMINATION FOR ELEVATOR TENSION MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  16.04.2010
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2010Revocation of patentpublished on 19.05.2010  [2010/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Otis Elevator Company
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032-2568 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/41]For all designated states
Otis Elevator Company
10 Farm Springs
Farmington, CT 06032-2568 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ERICSON, Richard, J.
71 Hunting Hill
Southington, CT 06489 / US
02 / REHMER, Dennis J.
155 Redstone Hill Road 72
Bristol, CT 06010 / US
03 / BARANDA, Pedro, S.
abedules 75
Col.St. Maria Insurgentes, Mexco D.F. / MX
 [2002/09]
Former [2001/41]01 / ERICSON, Richard, J.
71 Hunting Hill
Southington, CT 06489 / US
02 / REHMER, Dennis J.
155 Redstone Hill Road 72
Bristol, CT 06010 / US
03 / BARANDA, Pedro, S.
52 Berkshire Drive
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/41]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date99966424.617.12.1999
[2001/41]
WO1999US30227
Priority number, dateUS1998022404531.12.1998         Original published format: US 224045
[2001/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0040497
Date:13.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1140689
Date:10.10.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2000
[2001/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1140689
Date:06.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:B66B7/08
[2001/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT [2004/41]
Former [2001/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:KEILKLAMMER ENDUNGSTYP FÜR AUFZUGSZUGGLIED[2001/41]
English:WEDGE CLAMP TYPE TERMINATION FOR ELEVATOR TENSION MEMBER[2001/41]
French:TERMINAISON DE TYPE PINCE CLAVETTE POUR ELEMENT DE TENSION D'ASCENSEUR[2001/41]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2001National basic fee paid 
31.07.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.07.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/41]
02.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2004Fee for grant paid
27.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.05.2005  09.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
INVENTIO AG
Seestrasse 55
6052 Hergiswil / CH
 02  22.02.2008  22.02.2008  INTERVENTION
SCHINDLER S.A.
San Joaquin, 15
50080 Saragoza / ES
Opponent's representative
Verriest, Philippe
Cabinet Germain & Maureau
12, rue Boileau
BP 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
 03  15.03.2008  09.06.2005  INTERVENTION
Schindler Aufzüge und Fahrtreppen GmbH
Ringstrasse 54
12105 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Ernicke, Hans-Dieter
Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke
Schwibbogenplatz 2b
86153 Augsburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/27]
Opponent(s)01  31.05.2005  09.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
INVENTIO AG
Seestrasse 55
6052 Hergiswil / CH
 02  22.02.2008  22.02.2008  INTERVENTION
SCHINDLER S.A.
San Joaquin, 15
50080 Saragoza / ES
Opponent's representative
Verriest, Philippe
Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
 03  15.03.2008  09.06.2005  INTERVENTION
Schindler Aufzüge und Fahrtreppen GmbH
Ringstrasse 54
12105 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Ernicke, Hans-Dieter
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H.-D. Ernicke Dipl.-Ing. Klaus Ernicke Schwibbogenplatz 2b
86153 Augsburg / DE
Former [2008/19]
Opponent(s)01  31.05.2005  09.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
INVENTIO AG
Seestrasse 55
6052 Hergiswil / CH
 02  22.02.2008  22.02.2008  INTERVENTION
SCHINDLER S.A.
San Joaquin, 15
50080 Saragoza / ES
Opponent's representative
Verriest, Philippe
Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
 03  15.03.2008   
Schindler Aufzüge und Fahrtreppen GmbH
Ringstrasse 54
12105 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Ernicke, Hans-Dieter
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H.-D. Ernicke Dipl.-Ing. Klaus Ernicke Schwibbogenplatz 2b
86153 Augsburg / DE
Former [2008/15]
Opponent(s)01  31.05.2005  09.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
INVENTIO AG
Seestrasse 55
6052 Hergiswil / CH
 02  22.02.2008  22.02.2008  INTERVENTION
SCHINDLER S.A.
San Joaquin, 15
50080 Saragoza / ES
Opponent's representative
Verriest, Philippe
Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [2005/29]
Opponent(s)01  31.05.2005  09.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
INVENTIO AG
Seestrasse 55
6052 Hergiswil / CH
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
10.08.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.12.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.09.2007Date of oral proceedings
04.12.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.12.2007Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
18.02.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/20]
18.02.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition11.02.2008Appeal received No.  T0305/08
04.04.2008Statement of grounds filed
18.02.2010Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
18.02.2010Date of oral proceedings
24.02.2010Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES19.12.2005
[2007/23]
Cited inInternational search[XAY]FR2293392  (DECEMBER 4 DROTMUEVEK [HU]) [X] 1-5,9,10,17-19 * page 2, line 1 - page 4, line 2; figure 2 * [A] 24,25 [Y] 6,7,11-16,20,21;
 [YA]WO9829326  (KONE CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 6,7 * page 7, line 6 - page 10, line 23; figures 2-7 * [A] 1-5,8,26;
 [XAY]JPH033883  ;
 [YA]JPH0539180  ;
 [XAY]JPH01266341  ;
 [X]DE3623407  (HEUER HAMMER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 22-25,27 * column 5, line 30 - line 40; figures 1,2 *
 [XAY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910315), vol. 015, no. 109, Database accession no. (M - 1093), & JP03003883 A 19910109 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-5,10,25 * abstract * [A] 9 [Y] 11-13,15,16,21
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930623), vol. 017, no. 330, Database accession no. (M - 1434), & JP05039180 A 19930219 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 15,16,20 * abstract * [A] 1-3,11,13
 [XAY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900118), vol. 014, no. 026, Database accession no. (M - 921), & JP01266341 A 19891024 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-5,10,25,26 * abstract * [A] 9,11-13 [Y] 14