Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1027216

EP1027216 - BIORIENTED POLYETHYLENE FILM WITH A HIGH WATER VAPOR TRANSMISSION RATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.08.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
3225 Gallows Road
Fairfax, VA 22037 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/44]For all designated states
EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION
3225 Gallows Road
Fairfax, VI 22037-0001 / US
Former [2000/33]For all designated states
MOBIL OIL CORPORATION
3225 Gallows Road
Fairfax, Virginia 22037 / US
Inventor(s)01 / AGENT, Rhonda, Rogers
241 Townsend Street
Rochester, NY 14621 / US
02 / PIP, Hans, Joachim
167, rue de Sesselich
B-6700 Arlon / BE
[2000/33]
Representative(s)Dew, Melvyn John , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]Dew, Melvyn John , et al
Exxon Chemical Europe Inc. Law Technology P.O.Box 105
1830 Machelen / BE
Application number, filing date99968224.827.08.1999
[2000/33]
WO1999US19788
Priority number, dateUS1998014594902.09.1998         Original published format: US 145949
[2000/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0012302
Date:09.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1027216
Date:16.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000
[2000/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.03.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.2004
ClassificationInternational:B32B5/28, B32B27/32
[2000/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/33]
TitleGerman:BIORIENTIERTE POLYETHYLENFOLIE MIT HOHER WASSERDAMPFDURCHLÄSSIGKEIT[2000/33]
English:BIORIENTED POLYETHYLENE FILM WITH A HIGH WATER VAPOR TRANSMISSION RATE[2000/33]
French:FILM EN POLYETHYLENE A ORIENTATION BIOLOGIQUE A TAUX ELEVE DE TRANSMISSION DE LA VAPEUR D'EAU[2000/33]
Entry into regional phase25.05.2000National basic fee paid 
25.05.2000Search fee paid 
25.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
25.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
20.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.04.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/39]
09.05.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
06.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
08.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
07.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
03.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200103   M06   Fee paid on   07.11.2001
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO9916617  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [PX] 1-5,7-10 * page 7, line 19 - page 8, line 9 * * page 18, lines 3-23 * * page 25, lines 3-20 *;
 [X]WO9814491  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 5, line 35 - page 6, line 10 * * page 17, line 2 - line 32 * * page 21, line 7 - page 22, line 6; examples 5,6 *;
 [E]WO9959796  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [E] 1-10 * claim - *;
 [E]WO0009324  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [E] 1,4,6-9 * examples 4-6; claim - *
International search[XP]US5885721  (SU TIEN-KUEI [US], et al);
 [X]US4713273  (FREEDMAN MELVIN S [US]);
 [A]US5176954  (KELLER LAJOS E [LU], et al)