Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1112132

EP1112132 - CUTTING INSERT FOR GROOVING OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  27.02.2009
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.02.2009Revocation of patentpublished on 01.04.2009  [2009/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sandvik Intellectual Property AB
811 81 Sandviken / SE
[N/P]
Former [2006/16]For all designated states
Sandvik Intellectual Property AB
811 81 Sandviken / SE
Former [2004/10]For all designated states
SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG
811 81 Sandviken / SE
Former [2001/27]For all designated states
SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG
811 81 Sandviken / SE
Inventor(s)01 / TÄGTSTRÖM, Pär
Ärtvägen 11
S-811 62 Sandviken / SE
02 / HANSSON, Per
Iggövägen 57
S-805 96 Gävle / SE
03 / ANDERSSON, Claes
Hattmakargatan 13 C
S-803 11 Gävle / SE
 [2001/27]
Representative(s)Stein, Jan , et al
Groth & Co. KB
P.O. Box 6107
102 32 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2006/16]Stein, Jan Anders Lennart , et al
Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107
102 32 Stockholm / SE
Former [2001/27]Taquist, Lennart , et al
Sandvik AB Patent Department
811 81 SANDVIKEN / SE
Application number, filing date99968645.408.09.1999
[2001/27]
WO1999SE01565
Priority number, dateSE1998000308309.09.1998         Original published format: SE 9803083
[2001/27]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0013824
Date:16.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1112132
Date:04.07.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000
[2001/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1112132
Date:03.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE16.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:B23B27/04
[2001/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/27]
TitleGerman:SCHNEIDEINSATZ ZUM EINSTECHEN[2001/27]
English:CUTTING INSERT FOR GROOVING OPERATIONS[2001/27]
French:PLAQUETTE DE COUPE POUR OPERATIONS DE RAINURAGE[2001/27]
Entry into regional phase20.02.2001Translation filed 
20.02.2001National basic fee paid 
20.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
20.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
20.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/27]
18.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2003Fee for grant paid
17.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.11.2004  08.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
CERATIZIT Austria Gesellschaft m.b.H.
A-6600 Reutte/Tirol / AT
Opponent's representative
Kador, Utz Ulrich, et al
Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
 02  02.12.2004  15.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Iscar Ltd
P.O. Box 11
IL-Tefen 24959 / IL
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/39]
Opponent(s)01  29.11.2004  08.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
CERATIZIT Austria Gesellschaft m.b.H.
A-6600 Reutte/Tirol / AT
Opponent's representative
Kador, Ulrich, et al
Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
 02  02.12.2004  15.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Iscar Ltd
P.O. Box 11
IL-Tefen 24959 / IL
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2008/35]
Opponent(s)01  29.11.2004  08.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
CERATIZIT Austria Gesellschaft m.b.H.
A-6600 Reutte/Tirol / AT
Opponent's representative
Kador, Ulrich, et al
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
 02  02.12.2004  15.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Iscar Ltd
P.O. Box 11
IL-Tefen 24959 / IL
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2006/41]
Opponent(s)01  29.11.2004  08.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
CERATIZIT Austria Gesellschaft m.b.H.
A-6600 Reutte/Tirol / AT
Opponent's representative
Kador, Ulrich, et al
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
 02  02.12.2004  15.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Iscar Ltd
P.O. Box 11
IL-Tefen 24959 / IL
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2005/04]
Opponent(s)01  29.11.2004  08.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
CERATIZIT Austria Gesellschaft m.b.H.
A-6600 Reutte/Tirol / AT
 02  02.12.2004   
Iscar Ltd
P.O. Box 11
IL-Tefen 24959 / IL
Opponent's representative
VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2005/03]
Opponent(s)01  29.11.2004   
CERATIZIT Austria Gesellschaft m.b.H.
A-6600 Reutte/Tirol / AT
10.01.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.04.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.10.2006Date of oral proceedings
30.11.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.11.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
09.12.2008Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/14]
Appeal following opposition24.01.2007Appeal received No.  T0114/07
04.04.2007Statement of grounds filed
09.12.2008Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
09.12.2008Date of oral proceedings
12.12.2008Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
CY03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
PT03.08.2004
IE08.09.2004
LU08.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
[2008/18]
Former [2007/23]BE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
CY03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
IE08.09.2004
LU08.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2005/46]BE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
IE08.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2005/22]BE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2005/18]BE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/05]BE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/01]BE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2004/46]CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2004/44]CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI03.03.2004
SE03.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0802006  (PLANSEE TIZIT GMBH [AT]);
 [A]EP0716895  (ISCAR LTD [IL]);
 [A]EP0865851  (SANDVIK AB [SE])