Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1144459 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1144459



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1406
27.01.2011 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
27.01.2011 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
21.01.2011 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
11.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
11.01.2011 Description Opposition 1
11.01.2011 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
11.01.2011 French translation of claims Opposition 3
11.01.2011 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
11.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.10.2010 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
07.10.2010 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
07.10.2010 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
04.10.2010 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
19.08.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
16.08.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.08.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 50
09.08.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
23.04.2010 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
25.03.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.03.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.03.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.03.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.03.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.03.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.03.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
19.02.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.02.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.01.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.01.2010 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
20.08.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.08.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 21
17.04.2009 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.04.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.04.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.04.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 35
01.04.2009 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
17.02.2009 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
11.02.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
10.02.2009 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
09.02.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.02.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
09.02.2009 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
14.01.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.12.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.12.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.12.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
08.12.2008 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
08.12.2008 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 11
08.12.2008 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 8
08.12.2008 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
08.12.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.12.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.12.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
08.12.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
08.12.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
08.12.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.12.2008 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.12.2008 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.10.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 19
01.10.2008 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 13
29.09.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 19
29.09.2008 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 14
18.09.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.09.2008 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
05.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.07.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.07.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.07.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
18.07.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.07.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.04.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.04.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.03.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.03.2008 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 41
07.01.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 14
22.11.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.11.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
19.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
19.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
16.11.2007 Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure Appeal 1
16.11.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 32
26.10.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 35
19.10.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 35
19.10.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 16
17.09.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.09.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.08.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.08.2007 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
06.08.2007 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
20.04.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
20.04.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
28.03.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 1
28.03.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
09.03.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
20.02.2007 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Appeal 67
20.02.2007 Request concerning the applicant/representative Appeal 2
06.02.2007 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Appeal 2
02.02.2007 Brief communication Appeal 1
24.01.2007 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Appeal 4
24.01.2007 Request for transfer of rights Appeal 1
09.01.2007 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Appeal 2
09.01.2007 Request for transfer of rights Appeal 1
08.01.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 4
01.12.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.11.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
08.11.2006 Request for change of representative Appeal 1
15.05.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.05.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
11.05.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
11.05.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.05.2006 Request for change of representative Appeal 1
10.05.2006 Request for change of representative Appeal 1
08.05.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.01.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.01.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 33
12.01.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
12.01.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
12.01.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
10.01.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 34
12.09.2005 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
06.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
06.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
06.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 21
06.09.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
05.09.2005 Annex Appeal 3
05.09.2005 Drawings Appeal 6
05.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
05.09.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
21.07.2005 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
01.07.2005 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.07.2005 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
24.06.2005 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
23.06.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
22.06.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
19.05.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.05.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.05.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
06.05.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
06.05.2005 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
06.05.2005 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
06.05.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.05.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.05.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
06.05.2005 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.04.2005 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
08.04.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
05.04.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.04.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 19
04.04.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
01.04.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
30.03.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
29.03.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
28.02.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.2005 Claims Opposition 2
21.02.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
18.02.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
16.02.2005 Claims Opposition 2
16.02.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.02.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
30.09.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.09.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.09.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.09.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
20.09.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.09.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.07.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
01.07.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
20.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 28
19.02.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
06.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
06.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
06.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
06.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
06.02.2004 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
06.02.2004 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
04.02.2004 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
15.12.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.12.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.12.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
05.12.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
14.10.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
07.08.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.08.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
10.07.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
01.07.2003 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 17
01.07.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
01.07.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
01.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 63
01.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
01.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
01.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
22.08.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.07.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.07.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
23.07.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
22.07.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 5
02.05.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
22.04.2002 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
15.03.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
15.03.2002 Description Search / examination 1
15.03.2002 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.03.2002 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
04.12.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.12.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.12.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
12.11.2001 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.09.2001 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.07.2001 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
30.05.2001 Priority document Search / examination 27
30.05.2001 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
17.05.2001 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
04.05.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
04.05.2001 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.05.2001 Translation of priority document Search / examination 19
16.11.2000 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
16.11.2000 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 2
21.07.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.07.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.07.2000 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.07.2000 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.07.2000 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
21.07.2000 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
21.07.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.07.2000 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.06.2000 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
26.06.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.06.2000 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.06.2000 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
02.06.2000 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
25.05.2000 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
18.05.2000 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 22
09.05.2000 Urgent incoming letter International Searching Authority 1
06.03.2000 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
06.03.2000 Claims International Searching Authority 2
06.03.2000 Description International Searching Authority 18