Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1044447

EP1044447 - MATRIX DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  09.09.2011
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2011Refusal of applicationpublished on 12.10.2011  [2011/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trident Microsystems (Far East) Ltd.
Ugland House South Church Street
Grand Cayman / KY
[2010/48]
Former [2007/31]For all designated states
NXP B.V.
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
Former [2000/42]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / PLANGGER, Guido
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/42]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Postfach 20 07 34
80007 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/34]Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34
80007 München / DE
Former [2009/09]Williamson, Paul Lewis , et al
NXP Semiconductors UK Ltd. Intellectual Property Department Betchworth House Station Road Redhill
Surrey RH1 1DL / GB
Former [2007/02]White, Andrew Gordon , et al
NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Cross Oak Lane
Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
Former [2005/39]van der Veer, Johannis Leendert
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Prof. Holstlaan 6, Building WAH
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2000/42]Raap, Adriaan Yde , et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date99969172.831.08.1999
[2000/42]
WO1999EP06409
Priority number, dateEP1998020303810.09.1998         Original published format: EP 98203038
[2000/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0016305
Date:23.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1044447
Date:18.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000
[2000/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/36
[2000/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2004/20]
Former [2000/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:MATRIXANZEIGEEINRICHTUNG[2000/42]
English:MATRIX DISPLAY DEVICE[2000/42]
French:DISPOSITIF MATRICIEL DE PRESENTATION[2000/42]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2000National basic fee paid 
25.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
08.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2011Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/41]
31.03.2011Date of oral proceedings
20.05.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/41]
20.05.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.08.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
31.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
01.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
31.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0424030  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6 * page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 28; figures 1B,2B * * page 4, lines 2-37; figure 5 *