Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1115905

EP1115905 - COMPOSITE MATERIAL COATING AND A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 06.06.2007  [2007/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Widia GmbH
Münchener Strasse 90
45145 Essen / DE
[2001/29]
Inventor(s)01 / WESTPHAL, Hartmut
Schulstrasse 16
D-36466 Dermbach/Rhön / DE
02 / SOTTKE, Volkmar
Holzstrasse 182
D-45479 Mülheim / DE
 [2001/29]
Representative(s)Vomberg, Friedhelm
Schulstrasse 8
42653 Solingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/29]Vomberg, Friedhelm, Dipl.-Phys.
Schulstrasse 8
42653 Solingen / DE
Application number, filing date99969455.704.09.1999
[2001/29]
WO1999DE02859
Priority number, dateDE199814374324.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19843743
[2001/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0017416
Date:30.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1115905
Date:18.07.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2000
[2001/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1115905
Date:06.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:C23C30/00, C23C16/40
[2001/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/29]
TitleGerman:VERBUNDWERKSTOFF-ÜBERZUG UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG[2001/29]
English:COMPOSITE MATERIAL COATING AND A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF[2001/29]
French:REVETEMENT EN MATERIAU COMPOSITE ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE LE PRODUIRE[2001/29]
Entry into regional phase01.03.2001National basic fee paid 
01.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
01.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.04.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/29]
20.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2002Fee for grant paid
02.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
IE06.11.2002
DK06.02.2003
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
[2007/23]
Former [2003/43]FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
IE06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/42]GR06.11.2002
IE06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/31]GR06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/29]PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/19]SE06.02.2003
Cited inInternational search[DYA]DE19518927  (VALENITE INC [US]) [DY] 1-3,5,7-11 * abstract * * page 2, line 3 - line 8 * * page 3, line 42 - page 4, line 7 * * page 9, line 61 - page 10, line 20 * * figures 1-3; examples 1-6 * * claims 1,2,4,9,17-19,24-28,30,35 * [A] 6;
 [Y]EP0162656  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1-3,5,7-11 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - line 10 * * page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 16 * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 8 * * example 1; claims 1,2,5,6; table 1 *;
 [XA]EP0786536  (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) [X] 9-11 * page 1, line 7 - line 13 * * page 1, line 42 - page 2, line 25 * * example 4; tables 1,2,18-22 * * claims 2-8 * [A] 5,7,8;
 [A]EP0302984  (PACHER OSKAR DIPL ING DR) [A] 1-5,9-11 * page 3, line 8 - line 28 * * claims 1,2,4; table 1 *;
 [A]JPS62290870  ;
 [A]EP0732423  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-3,5-8 * claims 1-3,22 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880531), vol. 012, no. 186, Database accession no. (C - 500), [A] 1,2 * abstract *