EP1046092 - VOLTAGE AND/OR CURRENT REFERENCE CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE LANGEN, Klaas-Jan Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HUIJSING, Johan, H. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Hesselmann, Gerardus Johannes Maria, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Hesselmann, Gerardus Johannes Maria, et al Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2000/43] | de Haas, Laurens Johan, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 99969507.5 | 06.09.1999 | [2000/43] | WO1999EP06569 | Priority number, date | EP19980203138 | 18.09.1998 Original published format: EP 98203138 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0017725 | Date: | 30.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1046092 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G05F3/30 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
G05F3/30 (EP,US);
G05F3/265 (EP,US);
G05F3/267 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/43] | Title | German: | REFERENZSPANNUNGS- ODER STROMSCHALTUNG | [2000/43] | English: | VOLTAGE AND/OR CURRENT REFERENCE CIRCUIT | [2000/43] | French: | CIRCUIT DE REFERENCE DE TENSION ET/OU DE COURANT | [2000/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 25.01.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5471132 (RYAT MARC H [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * the whole document * [A] 3,5,8; | [XA]US5481180 (RYAT MARC H [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * column 1, line 50 - column 4, line 23 * [A] 3,5,8; | [A]US4593208 (SINGLE PETER S [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 17 *; | [A]US5619163 (KOO RONALD B [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |