EP1048093 - LOW CURRENT DENSITY ELECTROLYTIC CELL AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELTECH SYSTEMS CORPORATION 100 Seventh Avenue, Suite 300 Chardon Ohio 44024 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states ELTECH SYSTEMS CORPORATION 100 Seventh Avenue, Suite 300 Chardon, Ohio 44024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROMINE, Richard, L. 7351 Trotwood Drive Concord, OH 44077 / US | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Cronin, Brian Harold John, et al CRONIN Intellectual Property Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Cronin, Brian Harold John, et al Moinas Savoye & Cronin 42 rue Plantamour 1201 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 99969981.2 | 04.11.1999 | [2000/44] | WO1999US26107 | Priority number, date | US19980107136P | 05.11.1998 Original published format: US 107136 P | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0030187 | Date: | 25.05.2000 | [2000/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1048093 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C25B9/00 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
C25B9/19 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/44] | H01M16/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/44] | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYSEZELLE MIT NIEDRIGER STROMDICHTE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2000/44] | English: | LOW CURRENT DENSITY ELECTROLYTIC CELL AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME | [2000/44] | French: | CELLULE ELECTROLYTIQUE A FAIBLE DENSITE DE COURANT ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2000/44] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 31.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/10] | 08.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.06.2001 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   17.07.2001 | 27.06.2001 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   17.07.2001 | 27.06.2001 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   17.07.2001 | 27.06.2001 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   17.07.2001 | 27.06.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   17.07.2001 | 27.06.2001 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   17.07.2001 | 27.06.2001 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   17.07.2001 | 27.06.2001 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   17.07.2001 | 27.06.2001 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   17.07.2001 | 27.06.2001 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   17.07.2001 | 27.06.2001 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   17.07.2001 | 27.06.2001 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   17.07.2001 | 27.06.2001 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   17.07.2001 | 27.06.2001 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   17.07.2001 | 27.06.2001 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   17.07.2001 | 27.06.2001 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   17.07.2001 | 27.06.2001 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   17.07.2001 | 27.06.2001 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   17.07.2001 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.06.2001 | M01   Fee paid on   17.07.2001 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 30.11.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2601043 (OXYTECH SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7,8,10,12,14-16,18,19,21,23,24,26,28-32,35-39,44-46,49 * see whole document * |