Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1038628

EP1038628 - UNLEADED SOLDER POWDER AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.03.2006
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO., LTD.
11-1, Osaki 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8584 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/18]For all designated states
Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd.
11-1, Osaki 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8584 / JP
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd
11-1, Osaki 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8584 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HANAWA, Kenzo
569-63, Semata
Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-0151 / JP
02 / YANAGI, Kiyotaka c/o Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co.L
Corporate R & D Center, 1333-2, Haraichi
Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP
 [2005/17]
Former [2000/39]01 / HANAWA, Kenzo
569-63, Semata
Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-0151 / JP
02 / YANAGI, Kiyotaka Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co.Ltd.
Corporate R & D Center, 1333-2, Haraichi
Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP
Representative(s)Forstmeyer, Dietmar , et al
BOETERS & LIECK
Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Forstmeyer, Dietmar , et al
BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
Former [2005/17]Forstmeyer, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Boeters & Lieck, Bereiteranger 15
81541 München / DE
Former [2000/39]Forstmeyer, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date99970044.601.10.1999
[2000/39]
WO1999JP05406
Priority number, dateJP1998027982901.10.1998         Original published format: JP 27982998
[2000/39]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0020161
Date:13.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1038628
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1038628
Date:04.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.04.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2004
ClassificationInternational:B23K35/32, B23K35/26, B23K35/40
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
TitleGerman:BLEIFREIES LÖTPULVER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2000/39]
English:UNLEADED SOLDER POWDER AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR[2000/39]
French:POUDRE A BRASER SANS PLOMB ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION[2004/50]
Former [2000/39]POUDRE A SOUDER SANS PLOMB ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION
Entry into regional phase15.05.2000Translation filed 
15.05.2000National basic fee paid 
15.05.2000Search fee paid 
06.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
06.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
08.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2005Fee for grant paid
07.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
19.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.05.2005
BE04.05.2005
CH04.05.2005
FI04.05.2005
IT04.05.2005
LI04.05.2005
DK04.08.2005
GR04.08.2005
SE04.08.2005
ES15.08.2005
CY01.10.2005
IE03.10.2005
PT17.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
[2008/18]
Former [2007/23]AT04.05.2005
BE04.05.2005
CH04.05.2005
FI04.05.2005
LI04.05.2005
DK04.08.2005
GR04.08.2005
SE04.08.2005
ES15.08.2005
CY01.10.2005
IE03.10.2005
PT17.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
Former [2006/49]AT04.05.2005
BE04.05.2005
CH04.05.2005
FI04.05.2005
LI04.05.2005
DK04.08.2005
GR04.08.2005
SE04.08.2005
ES15.08.2005
IE03.10.2005
PT17.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
Former [2006/30]AT04.05.2005
BE04.05.2005
CH04.05.2005
FI04.05.2005
LI04.05.2005
DK04.08.2005
GR04.08.2005
SE04.08.2005
ES15.08.2005
PT17.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
Former [2006/14]AT04.05.2005
BE04.05.2005
CH04.05.2005
FI04.05.2005
LI04.05.2005
DK04.08.2005
GR04.08.2005
SE04.08.2005
ES15.08.2005
PT17.10.2005
Former [2006/13]AT04.05.2005
BE04.05.2005
FI04.05.2005
DK04.08.2005
SE04.08.2005
Former [2005/52]FI04.05.2005
SE04.08.2005
Former [2005/50]SE04.08.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9733713  (TECLE BERHAN [US]);
 [AP]US5885369  (HANAWA KENZO [JP], et al)
International search[Y]JPH09327789  (SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO, et al);
 [Y]JPH08164496  (HITACHI LTD);
 [Y]JPH03216292  (SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO);
 [Y]JPH04111993  (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP);
 [A]JPH0663788  (SHOWA DENKO KK);
 [A]EP0556864  (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US])